ENDURANCE AMERICAN SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY v. COLLINS CONSTRUCTION SERVICES INC et al
Plaintiff: ENDURANCE AMERICAN SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY
Defendant: COLLINS CONSTRUCTION SERVICES INC and HORIZON ROOFING LLC
Case Number: 3:2021cv00116
Filed: October 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: CLAY D LAND
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 24, 2021 Filing 17 RULES 16/26 ORDER: Proposed Scheduling/Discovery order due by 1/8/2022. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND on 11/24/2021. (tam)
November 23, 2021 Filing 16 Jurisdictional Statement by HORIZON ROOFING LLC (MARLOWE, DUSTIN)
November 23, 2021 Filing 15 Corporate Disclosure Statement by HORIZON ROOFING LLC (MARLOWE, DUSTIN)
November 23, 2021 Filing 14 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by HORIZON ROOFING LLC with Jury Demand.(MARLOWE, DUSTIN)Attorney DUSTIN R MARLOWE added to party HORIZON ROOFING LLC(pty:dft)
November 23, 2021 Filing 13 Jurisdictional Statement by COLLINS CONSTRUCTION SERVICES INC (O'Connell, Tracy)
November 23, 2021 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by COLLINS CONSTRUCTION SERVICES INC (O'Connell, Tracy)
November 23, 2021 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by COLLINS CONSTRUCTION SERVICES INC with Jury Demand.(O'Connell, Tracy)Attorney Tracy C O'Connell added to party COLLINS CONSTRUCTION SERVICES INC(pty:dft)
November 23, 2021 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #11 Answer to Complaint filed by COLLINS CONSTRUCTION SERVICES INC ); Notice to Counsel Tracy OConnell. The e mail address on the document does not match your e mail address in CM/ECF. If necessary, please update your e mail address via PACER.(hdw)
November 5, 2021 Filing 10 STIPULATION for Extension to File Answer by HORIZON ROOFING LLC (BARROW, CHARLES)
November 5, 2021 Filing 9 STIPULATION Regarding Enlargement of Time for Answering Complaint by COLLINS CONSTRUCTION SERVICES INC (O'Connell, Tracy)
November 5, 2021 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #10 Stipulation filed by HORIZON ROOFING LLC ); Local Rule 6.1 provides that the parties may stipulate to an extension of time, not to exceed 30 days, for the filing of an answer or affirmative defense to an action without leave of court. Therefore, the order included in this stipulation is not necessary and will not be executed by the court. (ggs)
October 21, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by ENDURANCE AMERICAN SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY as to HORIZON ROOFING LLC. (RAPP, STEPHEN)
October 21, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by ENDURANCE AMERICAN SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY as to COLLINS CONSTRUCTION SERVICES INC. (RAPP, STEPHEN)
October 19, 2021 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ENDURANCE AMERICAN SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY identifying Corporate Parent SOMPO JAPAN INSURANCE INC, Corporate Parent ENDURANCE SPECIALTY INSURANCE LTD, Corporate Parent Endurance American Insurance Company, Corporate Parent ENDURANCE ASSURANCE CORPORATION, Corporate Parent ENDURANCE U S HOLDINGS CORP, Corporate Parent SOMPO INTERNATIONAL HOLDINGS LTD, Corporate Parent SOMPO HOLDINGS INC SMPNY for ENDURANCE AMERICAN SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. (RAPP, STEPHEN)
October 19, 2021 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ENDURANCE AMERICAN SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY (RAPP, STEPHEN)
October 19, 2021 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #5 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by ENDURANCE AMERICAN SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY ); Document must be re-filed to add corporate parents, subsidiary corporations and/or any publicly held corporation that owns 10% or more of its stock to the case. These must be added within CM/ECF while the document is being filed.(ggs)
October 18, 2021 Filing 4 Jurisdictional Statement by ENDURANCE AMERICAN SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY (RAPP, STEPHEN)
October 18, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to HORIZON ROOFING, LLC. (ggs)
October 18, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to COLLINS CONSTRUCTION SERVICES, INC. (ggs)
October 18, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Fee paid: Receipt # AGAMDC-3925564, $402 filed by ENDURANCE AMERICAN SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Underlying Complaint, #3 Exhibit B- 1st Demand, #4 Exhibit C- 2nd Demand, #5 Exhibit D - Follow up Letter, #6 Summons Collins Construction Services, Inc., #7 Summons Horizon Roofing, LLC)(RAPP, STEPHEN)
October 18, 2021 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #1 Complaint, filed by ENDURANCE AMERICAN SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY ); Parties were added using punctuation AND/OR title capitalization. The case opening guide states ***REMINDER*** all parties must be added using ALL CAPS (ie LISA SMITH or DELTA AIRLINES). Do not use ANY punctuation when adding new parties. For instructions on adding parties, please refer to the Style Guide located on the website for the Middle District of Georgia. NO NEED TO REFILE, corrected by case manager.(ggs)
October 18, 2021 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #1 Complaint, filed by ENDURANCE AMERICAN SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY ); Pursuant to Local Rule 87.2 a Jurisdictional Statement must be filed.(ggs)
October 18, 2021 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #1 Complaint, filed by ENDURANCE AMERICAN SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY ); Pursuant to Local Rule 87.1, all nongovernmental corporate parties must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement. Please file the required corporate disclosures immediately.(ggs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ENDURANCE AMERICAN SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY v. COLLINS CONSTRUCTION SERVICES INC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ENDURANCE AMERICAN SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: STEPHEN J RAPP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COLLINS CONSTRUCTION SERVICES INC
Represented By: Tracy C O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HORIZON ROOFING LLC
Represented By: CHARLES BARROW
Represented By: DUSTIN R MARLOWE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?