BROOKLYN SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY RISK RETENTION GROUP INC. v BISON ADVISORS LLC
Plaintiff: BROOKLYN SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY RISK RETENTION GROUP INC
Defendant: BISON ADVISORS LLC and ARMIS ADVISERS LLC
Case Number: 3:2022cv00006
Filed: January 13, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: C ASHLEY ROYAL
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 3, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 28, 2022 Filing 12 RULES 16/26 ORDER: Proposed Scheduling/Discovery order due by 3/31/2022. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE C ASHLEY ROYAL on 2/28/2022. (Attachments: #1 Required Form)(nop)
February 25, 2022 Filing 11 Jurisdictional Statement by BISON ADVISORS LLC (PEREZ, MICHAEL)
February 25, 2022 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by BISON ADVISORS LLC identifying Corporate Parent BISON ADVISORS LLC, Other Affiliate ARMIS ADVISERS LLC, Other Affiliate BISON HOLDINGS LLC, Other Affiliate EAST ASSET MANAGEMENT LLC, Other Affiliate TETON CAPITAL PARTNERS LLC for BISON ADVISORS LLC. (PEREZ, MICHAEL)
February 25, 2022 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by BISON ADVISORS LLC.(PEREZ, MICHAEL)Attorney MICHAEL E PEREZ added to party BISON ADVISORS LLC(pty:dft)
February 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order granting Petition for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Petition Attached); Attorney Admission Fee Met by GRANT E FORTSON. (mdm)
February 10, 2022 Filing 7 PETITION TO THE CLERK FOR ADMISSION TO PLEAD AND PRACTICE PRO HAC VICE by BROOKLYN SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY RISK RETENTION GROUP INC Attorney Admission Fee (Pro Hac Vice) paid by Receipt # AGAMDC-4013773, $100. LOCAL COUNSEL Name and Georgia Bar #: Seth M. Friedman GA141501. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(FORTSON, GRANT)
January 31, 2022 Filing 6 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed by BISON ADVISORS LLC, Acknowledgment filed by BROOKLYN SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY RISK RETENTION GROUP INC. (FRIEDMAN, SETH) Modified on 1/31/2022 to edit text. (ggs).
January 31, 2022 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #6 Acknowledgment of Service filed by BROOKLYN SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY RISK RETENTION GROUP INC); Documents must be converted into text-searchable PDF format prior to filing. See CM/ECF Administrative Procedures, page 9. NO NEED TO REFILE for future reference only.(ggs)
January 14, 2022 Filing 5 Jurisdictional Statement by BROOKLYN SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY RISK RETENTION GROUP INC (FRIEDMAN, SETH)
January 14, 2022 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by BROOKLYN SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY RISK RETENTION GROUP INC (FRIEDMAN, SETH)
January 14, 2022 Filing 3 DISREGARD - REFILED AT TAB 5 - Jurisdictional Statement by BROOKLYN SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY RISK RETENTION GROUP INC (FRIEDMAN, SETH) Modified on 1/14/2022 (ggs).
January 13, 2022 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to BISON ADVISORS LLC. (ggs)
January 13, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Bison Advisors, LLC Fee paid: Receipt # AGAMDC-3989844, $402 filed by Brooklyn Specialty Insurance Company Risk Retention Group, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Policy Dec Pages, #2 Exhibit 2 - Release Affidavit, #3 Exhibit 3 - Consent Judgment, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Summons to Bison Advisors, LLC)(FRIEDMAN, SETH)
January 13, 2022 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #1 Complaint, filed by Brooklyn Specialty Insurance Company Risk Retention Group, Inc. ); Parties were added using punctuation AND/OR title capitalization. The attorney case opening guide states ***REMINDER*** all parties must be added using ALL CAPS (ie LISA SMITH or DELTA AIRLINES). Do not use ANY punctuation when adding new parties. For instructions on adding parties, please refer to the Style Guide located on the website for the Middle District of Georgia. Please do not re-file, corrected by case manager.(ggs)
January 13, 2022 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #1 Complaint, filed by BROOKLYN SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY RISK RETENTION GROUP INC ); All nongovernmental corporate parties must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement. See Local Rule 87.1. ADDITIONALLY, in diversity cases, a Jurisdictional Statement must be filed. See Local Rule 87.2. Please file the required Corporate Disclosure Statement and Jurisdictional Statement immediately. Please note, these are separate documents and are not to be combined into one document.(ggs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BROOKLYN SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY RISK RETENTION GROUP INC. v BISON ADVISORS LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BROOKLYN SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY RISK RETENTION GROUP INC
Represented By: SETH MICHAEL FRIEDMAN
Represented By: GRANT E FORTSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BISON ADVISORS LLC
Represented By: MICHAEL E PEREZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ARMIS ADVISERS LLC
Represented By: MICHAEL E PEREZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?