BOSTON v. DOE
Plaintiff: BENJAMIN BOSTON
Defendant: JOHN DOE
Case Number: 3:2022cv00028
Filed: March 14, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: CLAY D LAND
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 31 U.S.C. ยง 3723 Federal Tort Claims Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 17, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 17, 2022 Filing 5 Acknowledgment of Electronic Case Transfer Out by District of Northern District of Georgia; Case Number 1:22-cv-1067. (ggs)
March 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF TRANSFER transferring proceedings to the U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Georgia, Atlanta Division. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND on 3/16/2022. (ggs)
March 16, 2022 Case Electronically Transferred Out - District Transfer to Northern District of Georgia, Atlanta Division. All documents, including a certified copy of the docket sheet and pleading were transferred electronically. **The Notice of Electronic Filing serves as certification for these transferred documents.**Case Transfer Acknowledgment deadline 3/30/2022. (ggs)
March 14, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Intent to File Claim against Doraville Peace Officer Badge No. 1182. by BENJAMIN BOSTON re #1 Complaint (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(ggs)
March 14, 2022 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Filed by BENJAMIN BOSTON. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(ggs)
March 14, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against JOHN DOE, filed by BENJAMIN BOSTON. (Attachments: #1 Doraville Jail Inmate Property Retention Form, #2 Claim for Damage, Injury, or Death, DOJ Standard Form 95, #3 Envelope)(ggs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BOSTON v. DOE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BENJAMIN BOSTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?