NGUYEN v. GARLAND et al
Defendant: CHRISTOPHER WRAY, MICAH R BROWN, MERRICK GARLAND and UR MENDOZA JADDOU
Petitioner: THI QUYNH NHU NGUYEN
Case Number: 3:2024cv00113
Filed: November 6, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: TILMAN E SELF
Nature of Suit: Mandamus & Other
Cause of Action: 8 U.S.C. ยง 1446 Petition for Naturalization Hearing
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 10, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 10, 2024 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by THI QUYNH NHU NGUYEN as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit USPS Tracking-Jaddou, #2 Exhibit USPS Tracking-Wray, #3 Exhibit USPS Tracking-Brown, #4 Exhibit USPS Tracking-USAO)(GOLDSTEIN, CHRISTINA)
November 22, 2024 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to United States Attorney. (aen)
November 20, 2024 Filing 4 Letter from U.S. Attorney's Office to Plaintiff's counsel regarding insufficient service of process. (Attachments: #1 Envelope).(aen)
November 12, 2024 Filing 3 COMPLAINT (IFP) against All Defendants filed by THI QUYNH NHU NGUYEN (Attachments: #1 Exhibit N-400 Receipt for Petitioner, #2 Exhibit Biometrics Receipt for Petitioner, #3 Exhibit Notice of Interview Results for Petitioner, #4 Exhibit N-400 Processing Times at USCIS Atlanta)(GOLDSTEIN, CHRISTINA)
November 12, 2024 SECOND NOTICE of Deficiency (related document(s): #1 Complaint, filed by THI QUYNH NHU NGUYEN ); JUDGE WILL BE NOTIFIED OF FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH THIS SECOND NOTICE OF DEFICIENCYDocument must be re-filed to include a description of attachment(s). A generic identifier such as Exhibit A or Exhibit 1 is not acceptable. An example of a properly identified attachment would be Exhibit A Letter from A. Hamilton to A. Burr. See CM/ECF Administrative Procedures.Participants are expected to make corrections within 2 business days of receiving the Notice of Deficiency. If corrections are not made in a timely manner, the matter will be referred to chambers and may result in an Order to Show Cause. See Administrative Procedures for Electronic Filing.(aen)
November 6, 2024 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to MICAH R BROWN, MERRICK GARLAND, UR MENDOZA JADDOU, CHRISTOPHER WRAY. (Attachments: #1 Summons UR MENDOZA JADDOU, #2 Summons CHRISTOPHER WRAY, #3 Summons MICAH R BROWN)(aen)
November 6, 2024 Filing 1 Disregard, refiled at tab 3 - COMPLAINT against All Defendants Fee paid: Receipt # BGAMDC-4791797, $405 filed by THI QUYNH NHU NGUYEN (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit List, #2 Summons Garland, #3 Summons Jaddou, #4 Summons Wray, #5 Summons Brown)(GOLDSTEIN, CHRISTINA) Modified on 11/12/2024 (aen).
November 6, 2024 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #1 Complaint, filed by THI QUYNH NHU NGUYEN ); Notice to Counsel CHRISTINA GOLDSTEIN. The email address on the document (immigration@npattorney.com) does not match your email address in CM/ECF (christina@npattorney.com). If necessary, please update your email address via PACER. Exhibits and/or other supporting documents with an electronic filing shall be filed as a separate PDF attachment(s) to the filing. See Administrative Procedures for Electronic Filing. Document must be refiled with exhibits as separate attachments with a proper description. See Administrative Procedures for Electronic Filing. When refiling Complaint, select the Complaint (IFP) event to avoid paying the filing fee again.(aen)
November 6, 2024 US MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES H WEIGLE no longer assigned to case. (aen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NGUYEN v. GARLAND et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHRISTOPHER WRAY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICAH R BROWN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MERRICK GARLAND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UR MENDOZA JADDOU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: THI QUYNH NHU NGUYEN
Represented By: CHRISTINA GOLDSTEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?