Jordan et al v. The Scott Fetzer Company
Plaintiff: James Jordan and Mary Jordan
Defendant: The Scott Fetzer Company
Case Number: 4:2007cv00080
Filed: May 9, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Office: Columbus Office
County: Muscogee
Presiding Judge: Clay D. Land
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER denying 72 Pl.'s Motion to Certify Class; finding as moot 86 Def.'s Motion to Exclude Putative Experts. Ordered by Judge Clay D. Land on 09/30/2010. (jbo)
September 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER granting 95 Motion to Exclude Evidence for Discovery Sanction; finding as moot 102 Motion (Daubert Challenge) to Exclude Expert Rodney Bosco. Ordered by Judge Clay D. Land on 09/07/2010. (jbo)
June 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER granting 48 Amended Motion to Compel. Ordered by Judge Clay D. Land on 06/30/2009. (lra)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jordan et al v. The Scott Fetzer Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Jordan
Represented By: C. Lance Gould
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Jordan
Represented By: W. Daniel Miles, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Scott Fetzer Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?