JONES v. KILPATRICK

Petitioner: TRISTEN V JONES
Respondent: TERENCE KILPATRICK
Case Number: 4:2018cv00188
Filed: September 17, 2018
Court: Georgia Middle District Court
0 Judge: STEPHEN HYLES
1 Judge: CLAY D LAND
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 17, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
September 17, 2018 12 Featured Case ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Hyles issued at the direction of the Court (tlf).
September 17, 2018 Added US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND and US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES. Motions referred to US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES(tlf).
September 17, 2018 11 Case transferred in District Transfer from District of Georgia Southern; Case Number 6:18-cv-00022. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. **The Notice of Electronic Filing serves as certification for these transferred documents.**
September 17, 2018 10 Featured Case ORDER transferring case to the United States District Court for the Middle District of Georgia, Columbus Division. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 9/17/2018. (csr) [Transferred from gasd on 9/17/2018.]
September 5, 2018 Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro pursuant to standing Order in 1:18-mc-12. Magistrate Judge R. Stan Baker-MJ no longer assigned to the case. (jrb) [Transferred from gasd on 9/17/2018.]
September 4, 2018 9 Featured Case ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to District Judge R. Stan Baker for all further proceedings. Chief Judge J. Randal Hall no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief Judge J. Randal Hall on 9/4/18. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (trb) [Transferred from gasd on 9/17/2018.]
August 9, 2018 8 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Tristen V. Jones. Responses due by 8/23/2018. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)REFERRED to Judge R. Stan Baker.(ca) [Transferred from gasd on 9/17/2018.]
August 9, 2018 7 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (corrected form), filed by Tristen V. Jones. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(ca) [Transferred from gasd on 9/17/2018.]
July 16, 2018 6 MOTION / Letter to Appoint Counsel by Tristen V. Jones. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)REFERRED to Judge R. Stan Baker.(ca) [Transferred from gasd on 9/17/2018.]
July 10, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Compliance due by 7/31/2018. (ca) [Transferred from gasd on 9/17/2018.]
July 10, 2018 5 Featured Case ORDER deferring ruling on #4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Court DIRECTS Jones to re-submit his Petition on the correct form within twenty-one (21) days of the date of this Order. The Court DIRECTS the Clerk to provide Jones with a blank copy of the form Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus under 28 U.S.C. 2254. Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Stan Baker on 7/10/2018. (ca) [Transferred from gasd on 9/17/2018.]
March 28, 2018 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Tristen V. Jones. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)REFERRED to Judge R. Stan Baker.(ca) [Transferred from gasd on 9/17/2018.]
March 5, 2018 3 NOTICE of Filing Deficiency re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, signature was omitted. (ca) [Transferred from gasd on 9/17/2018.]
March 5, 2018 2 NOTICE of Filing Deficiency re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filing fee was omitted. Set/Reset Deadlines: Compliance due by 3/26/2018. (ca) [Transferred from gasd on 9/17/2018.]
March 5, 2018 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Tristen V. Jones. (Attachments: #1 Attachment, #2 Envelope)(ca) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/28/2018: #3 Signature pages) (ca). [Transferred from gasd on 9/17/2018.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JONES v. KILPATRICK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: TRISTEN V JONES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: TERENCE KILPATRICK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?