ISAAC v. DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY et al
Plaintiff: XAVIER ISAAC
Defendant: DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS, VENDEE MORTGAGE TRUST, JOHN DANIEL, DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY, SHAPIRO PENDERGAST & HASTY LLP and CARRINGTON MORTGAGE SERVICES LLC
Case Number: 4:2018cv00198
Filed: September 28, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: STEPHEN HYLES
Referring Judge: CLAY D LAND
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 9, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 9, 2018 Filing 17 USM 285 Process Receipt and Return UNEXECUTED for DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS (tlp)
November 5, 2018 Filing 16 USM 285 Process Receipt and Return EXECUTED for CARRINGTON MORTGAGE SERVICES LLC and SHAPIRO PENDERGAST & HASTY LLP. (esl)
November 2, 2018 Filing 15 USM 285 Process Receipt and Return EXECUTED for JOHN DANIEL (tlp)
November 1, 2018 Filing 14 This is a text only entry; no document issued. ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff shall have an additional thirty (30) days to file a recast complaint. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES on 11-1-18 (jdl)
October 31, 2018 Filing 13 USM 285 Process Receipt and Return EXECUTED for CIVIL PROCESS CLERK - DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS (tlp)
October 29, 2018 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Recast Complaint, filed by XAVIER ISAAC. (Attachments: #1 Supporting documentatoin to Complaint: Mortgage, Bank, and SSA docs, #2 Envelope). Motion(s) referred to STEPHEN HYLES.(tlp)
October 26, 2018 Filing 11 USM 285 Process Receipt and Return MAILED for Defendants
October 18, 2018 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to USA Defendants, inlcuding Civil Process Clerk and U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (tlp)
October 18, 2018 Filing 9 USM 285 Process Receipt and Return ISSUED for DEFENDANTS including Civil Process Clerk and U.S. Attorney(tlp) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/18/2018: #1 Revised USM-285) (tlp).
October 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER to Recast Complaint:(); granting #6 Motion for More Definite Statement. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES on 10-17-18. (jdl)
October 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge issued at the direction of the Court. (tlp)
October 16, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION and Memorandum in Support of MOTION for More Definite Statement by CARRINGTON MORTGAGE SERVICES LLC filed by CHANDLER THOMPSON. Motion(s) referred to STEPHEN HYLES.(THOMPSON, CHANDLER) Modified on 10/17/2018 (tlp).
October 16, 2018 Filing 5 This is a text only entry; no document issued. ORDER granting #4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES on 10-16-18. (jdl)
October 15, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (long form) amending #2 Motion, filed by XAVIER ISAAC. (Attachments: #1 Supporting documentation, #2 Envelope). Motion(s) referred to STEPHEN HYLES.(tlp)
October 1, 2018 Filing 3 This is a text only entry; no document issued.ORDER directing Plaintiff to submit completed long-form IFP motion within fourteen (14) days and directing the Clerk to provide Plaintiff with standard IFP long-form for completion. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES on 10-1-18. (jdl)
September 28, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by XAVIER ISAAC. Motion referred to US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES(tlf).
September 28, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by XAVIER ISAAC against CARRINGTON MORTGAGE SERVICES LLC, JOHN DANIEL, DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS, DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY, SHAPIRO PENDERGAST & HASTY LLP, and VENDEE MORTGAGE TRUST (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Mortgage Documents, #3 Envelope)(tlf).
September 28, 2018 US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES added for the purpose of ruling on motion on IFP (tlf).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ISAAC v. DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VENDEE MORTGAGE TRUST
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DANIEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHAPIRO PENDERGAST & HASTY LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CARRINGTON MORTGAGE SERVICES LLC
Represented By: CHANDLER THOMPSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: XAVIER ISAAC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?