GREENE v. INTUIT INC et al
Plaintiff: SHEREEN R GREENE
Defendant: INTUIT INC, JOHN AND OR JANE DOES, MERS INC, AMROCK INC, COOK & JAMES LLC, ROCKET MORTGAGE, ADT SECURITY SERVICES INC, MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS INC, RUBIN LUBLIN LLC, QUICKEN LOANS and LIBERTY UTILITIES
Case Number: 4:2018cv00199
Filed: September 28, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: STEPHEN HYLES
Referring Judge: CLAY D LAND
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 26, 2018 Filing 18 USM 285 Process Receipt and Return issued for RUBIN LUBLIN, LLC (tlf).
November 26, 2018 Filing 17 AMENDED Complaint (IFP) by SHEREEN R. GREENE (tlf).
November 25, 2018 NOTICE OF SETTING HEARING ON MOTION re #15 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint (IFP), #4 Amended Complaint/PetitionMOTION for Preliminary InjunctionMOTION for Temporary Restraining Order : Motion Hearing set for 12/13/2018 02:00 PM in Columbus before US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND. (glg)
November 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 Motion to Amend complaint, denying #15 Motion for TRO, and scheduling a hearing for motion for preliminary injunction. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D. LAND on 11/21/2018 (tlf).
November 19, 2018 Filing 15 MOTION to Amend #1 Complaint (IFP) #4 Amended Complaint and MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and for Temporary Restraining Order filed by SHEREEN R. GREENE (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Notice of Acceleration and Foreclosure)(tlf).
November 8, 2018 Filing 14 USM 285 Process Receipt and Return mailed for ADT SECURITY SERVICES INC, LIBERTY UTILITIES (tlf).
November 7, 2018 Filing 13 USM 285 Process Receipt and Return mailed for AMROCK INC, COOK & JAMES LLC, MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS INC, QUICKEN LOANS, ROCKET MORTGAGE (tlf).
November 6, 2018 Filing 12 USM 285 Process Receipt and Return issued for ADT SECURITY SERVICES INC, LIBERTY UTILITIES (tlf).
November 6, 2018 Filing 11 RESPONSE to 10 Court Order filed by SHEREEN R. GREENE (tlf).
November 1, 2018 Filing 10 This is a text only entry; no document issued.ORDER directing Plaintiff to provide addresses for the Defendants "Liberty Utilities" and "ADT" named in her #4 Amended Complaint/Petition. Plaintiff must comply with this Order within seven (7) days. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES on 11-1-18. (bdd)
November 1, 2018 Filing 9 USM 285 Process Receipt and Return issued for AMROCK INC, COOK & JAMES LLC, INTUIT INC, QUICKEN LOANS, and ROCKET MORTGAGE (tlf).
November 1, 2018 Filing 8 This is a text only entry; no document issued. ORDER denying as moot #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; granting #7 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and directing service by the United States Marshals Service. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES on 11-1-18 (bdd)
October 30, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by SHEREEN R. GREENE. Motion referred to US MAGISTRARTE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES (tlf).
October 30, 2018 Filing 6 RESPONSE (Motion Pleading Not to Dismiss for Failure to Comply) to Court Order filed by SHEREEN R GREENE re #5 Order to Show Cause (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Front Page of Amended Complaint filed on 10/3/2018)(tlf).
October 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Plaintiff must respond within fourteen (14) days. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES on 10-24-18. (bdd)
October 3, 2018 Filing 4 AMENDED #1 Complaint (IFP) by SHEREEN R. GREENE against AMROCK INC, COOK & JAMES LLC, JOHN AND OR JANE DOES, MERS INC, ROCKET MORTGAGE, QUICKEN LOANS, ADT SECURITY SERVICES INC (tlf).
October 1, 2018 Filing 3 This is a text only entry; no document issued. ORDER directing Plaintiff to supplement #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis with further information within fourteen (14) days. Plaintiff's supplement must include a statement, under oath, regarding how she obtains the necessities of daily living such as food. The Clerk is directed to send Plaintiff blank IFP forms on which Plaintiff may submit supplemented IFP motion with the required information. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES on 10-1-18. (bdd)
September 28, 2018 US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES added.. Motion(s) referred to STEPHEN HYLES.(tlp)
September 28, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by SHEREEN R GREENE.(tlp)
September 28, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (IFP) against ALL DEFENDANTS (tlp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GREENE v. INTUIT INC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INTUIT INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN AND OR JANE DOES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MERS INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMROCK INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COOK & JAMES LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROCKET MORTGAGE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ADT SECURITY SERVICES INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RUBIN LUBLIN LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: QUICKEN LOANS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LIBERTY UTILITIES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHEREEN R GREENE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?