RAY v. FUR-BABY PET SERVICES, LLC et al
Plaintiff: MICHAEL RAY
Defendant: FUR-BABY PET SERVICES, LLC, MAKARA SON and FUR-BABY PET SERVICES LLC
Case Number: 4:2018cv00213
Filed: October 16, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: CLAY D LAND
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 16, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 16, 2018 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by FUR-BABY PET SERVICES LLC identifying Corporate Parent FUR BABY PET SERVICES LLC for FUR-BABY PET SERVICES LLC. (CHILDS, RICHARD)
November 16, 2018 Notice of Deficiency; Corporate Disclosure Statement must be SEPARATELY filed; Related document: #7 Answer to Complaint filed by MAKARA SON, FUR-BABY PET SERVICES LLC; The corporate disclosures were filed as an attachment to the answer. They must be filed separately as Civil Events, Other Filings, Other Documents, Corporate Disclosure Statement (tlf).
November 16, 2018 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by FUR-BABY PET SERVICES LLC, MAKARA SON. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Corporate Disclosure Statement)(CHILDS, RICHARD)
November 14, 2018 Filing 6 RULES 16/26 ORDER: Proposed Scheduling/Discovery order due by 12/28/2018. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D. LAND on 11/14/2018 (tlf).
November 13, 2018 Notice of Deficiency : Pursuant to Local Rule 87.1, all nongovernmental corporate parties must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement. Please file the required corporate disclosures immediately. (tlp)
November 9, 2018 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by FUR-BABY PET SERVICES LLC, MAKARA SON.(CHILDS, RICHARD)Attorney RICHARD ALLEN CHILDS added to party FUR-BABY PET SERVICES LLC(pty:dft), Attorney RICHARD ALLEN CHILDS added to party MAKARA SON(pty:dft)
October 23, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by MICHAEL RAY as to All Defendants. (ROPER, JOHN)
October 17, 2018 Filing 3 Summons issued as to MAKARA SON (tlf).
October 17, 2018 Filing 2 Summons issued as to FUR-BABY PET SERVICES, LLC (tlf).
October 16, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Fee paid: Receipt # 113G-2998219, $400 filed by MICHAEL RAY (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Verification, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(ROPER, JOHN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RAY v. FUR-BABY PET SERVICES, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FUR-BABY PET SERVICES, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MAKARA SON
Represented By: RICHARD ALLEN CHILDS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FUR-BABY PET SERVICES LLC
Represented By: RICHARD ALLEN CHILDS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL RAY
Represented By: JOHN W ROPER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?