SHAVERS v. UNUM LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA
Plaintiff: MARTINA SHAVERS
Defendant: UNUM LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA
Case Number: 4:2018cv00238
Filed: December 10, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: CLAY D LAND
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 24, 2019 Filing 8 RULES 16/26 ORDER:Proposed Scheduling/Discovery order due by 3/7/2019. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND on 1/24/2019. (tlp)
January 22, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by UNUM LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA identifying Corporate Parent UNUM GROUP for UNUM LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA. (CARTER, SANDERS)
January 22, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by UNUM LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA.(CARTER, SANDERS)
January 18, 2019 Notice of Deficiency (related document: Pursuant to Local Rule 87.1, all nongovernmental corporate parties must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement. Corporate Disclosure Statement must be refiled as a separate entry to add corporate parents, subsidiary corporations and/or any publicly held corporation that owns 10% or more of its stock to the case. Please file the required corporate disclosures immediately. (tlp)
January 2, 2019 Filing 5 STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT through and including January 21, 2019, re #1 Complaint, by UNUM LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA (CARTER, SANDERS)
January 2, 2019 Notice of Deficiency as to 4 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by UNUM LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA. Insofar as Local Rule 6.1 provides: " Any extensions of time within which to answer the complaint or an amended complaint by affirmative defenses or other defensive pleadings may be done by written, filed stipulations of counsel, not to exceed more than thirty (30) days from the original answer deadline without approval of the court, and insofar as the requested extension does not exceed 30 days the motion for extension of time, said motion will be construed as such a stipulation and administratively terminated without ruling by the court. Therefore, 4 Motion has been terminated. (tlp)
December 31, 2018 Filing 4 CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by UNUM LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA filed by SANDERS CARTER, JR. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(CARTER, SANDERS)
December 18, 2018 Filing 3 RETURN OF SERVICE/SUMMONS Returned Executed by MARTINA SHAVERS as to UNUM LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Summons Executed)(KARRH, HEATHER) Modified on 12/18/2018 (tlp).
December 11, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to UNUM LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA. (tlp)
December 10, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against UNUM LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA Fee paid: Receipt # 113G-3039208, $400 filed by MARTINA SHAVERS (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons Form)(KARRH, HEATHER)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SHAVERS v. UNUM LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARTINA SHAVERS
Represented By: HEATHER K KARRH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNUM LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA
Represented By: ANDREA K CATALAND
Represented By: SANDERS CARTER, JR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?