SHIV JI SHANKER, LLC
Petitioner: QUANTUM NATIONAL BANK
Undetermined: CLERK KYLE GEORGE
Appellant: SHIV JI SHANKER, LLC
Trustee: US TRUSTEE - MAC
Case Number: 4:2019cv00032
Filed: March 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: CLAY D LAND
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 12, 2019 Filing 4 This is a text only entry; no document issued.ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Appellant shall show cause within seven days (by April 19, 2019) why his appeal should not be dismissed as abandoned for failure to serve the designation required under Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 8009. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND on 04/12/2019. (CCL)
March 12, 2019 Filing 3 AMENDED MOTION Amending #2 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Quantum National Bank filed by Jody Jody Campbell. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Campbell, Jody)
March 12, 2019 Filing 2 (Refiled as ECF No. 3) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Quantum National Bank filed by JODY CHARLES CAMPBELL. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(CAMPBELL, JODY)
March 5, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT filed by SHIV JI SHANKER, LLC (US BANKRUPTCY COURT, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SHIV JI SHANKER, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: CLERK KYLE GEORGE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: SHIV JI SHANKER, LLC
Represented By: JOSEPH H TURNER, JR
Represented By: JOSEPH H TURNER-INACTIVE, JR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: QUANTUM NATIONAL BANK
Represented By: Jody Jody Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: US TRUSTEE - MAC
Represented By: Robert G. Fenimore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?