SHIV JI SHANKER, LLC
Petitioner: QUANTUM NATIONAL BANK
Undetermined: CLERK KYLE GEORGE
Appellant: SHIV JI SHANKER, LLC
Trustee: US TRUSTEE - MAC
Case Number: 4:2019cv00033
Filed: March 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: CLAY D LAND
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 18, 2019 Filing 6 JUDGMENT in favor of QUANTUM NATIONAL BANK against SHIV JI SHANKER, LLC (esl)
April 15, 2019 Filing 5 This is a text only entry; no document issued. ORDER. The Court previously ordered Appellant to show cause by April 10, 2019 why his appeal should not be dismissed as abandoned for failure to serve the designation required under Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 8009. Appellant did not respond to the Court's show cause order. His appeal is dismissed as abandoned. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND on 04/15/2019. (CCL)
April 3, 2019 Filing 4 This is a text only entry; no document issued. ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Appellant shall show cause within seven days (by April 10, 2019) why his appeal should not be dismissed as abandoned for failure to serve the designation required under Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 8009. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND on 04/03/2019. (CCL)
March 12, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Quantum National Bank filed by JODY CHARLES CAMPBELL. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(CAMPBELL, JODY)
March 12, 2019 Filing 2 ***DISREGARD - MOTION TERMINTED - REFILED AT TAB 3*** MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Quantum National Bank filed by JODY CHARLES CAMPBELL.(CAMPBELL, JODY) Modified on 3/12/2019 (ggs).
March 5, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT filed by SHIV JI SHANKER, LLC (US BANKRUPTCY COURT, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SHIV JI SHANKER, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: CLERK KYLE GEORGE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: SHIV JI SHANKER, LLC
Represented By: JOSEPH H TURNER, JR
Represented By: JOSEPH H TURNER-INACTIVE, JR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: QUANTUM NATIONAL BANK
Represented By: Jody Jody Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: US TRUSTEE - MAC
Represented By: Robert G. Fenimore
Represented By: ELIZABETH A HARDY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?