HARVEY v. LUMPKIN, CITY OF et al

Plaintiff: ELIJAH HARVEY
Defendant: Gary Yochum, Jr., CHIEF JOHN TYLER, SHANENA HALE, LUMPKIN, CITY OF, SGT MYERS, WILL HOUSE and WILLIAM GARY YOCHUM, JR
Case Number: 4:2019cv00046
Filed: March 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: CLAY D LAND
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2019 Filing 11 This is a text only entry; no document issued. ORDER granting #10 Motion to Stay. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND on 7/12/2019 (hmb)
July 11, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Stay Proceedings and Brief in Support Thereof by SHANENA HALE, LUMPKIN, CITY OF, MYERS, JOHN TYLER, WILLIAM GARY YOCHUM, JR filed by RUSSELL A BRITT.(BRITT, RUSSELL)
July 11, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by SHANENA HALE, WILL HOUSE, LUMPKIN, CITY OF, MYERS, JOHN TYLER, WILLIAM GARY YOCHUM, JR filed by RUSSELL A BRITT. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Their Pre-Answer Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint)(BRITT, RUSSELL)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND on 6/24/2019. (esl)
March 22, 2019 Filing 7 Summons issued as to GARY YOCHUM JR. (tlf).
March 22, 2019 Filing 6 Summons issued as to JOHN TYLER (tlf).
March 22, 2019 Filing 5 Summons issued as to Officer Myers (tlf).
March 22, 2019 Filing 4 Summons issued as to WILL HOUSE (tlf).
March 22, 2019 Filing 3 Summons issued as to SHANENA HALE (tlf).
March 22, 2019 Filing 2 Summons issued as to the CITY OF LUMPKIN (tlf).
March 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ELIJAH HARVEY Fee paid: Receipt # 113G-3108913, $400 filed by ELIJAH HARVEY (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons CITY OF LUMPKIN, #3 Summons HOUSE, #4 Summons MYERS, #5 Summons TYLER, #6 Summons YOCHUM, #7 Summons HALE)(HARRIS, KATONGA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HARVEY v. LUMPKIN, CITY OF et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Yochum, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHIEF JOHN TYLER
Represented By: RUSSELL A BRITT
Represented By: PEARSON K CUNNINGHAM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHANENA HALE
Represented By: RUSSELL A BRITT
Represented By: PEARSON K CUNNINGHAM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LUMPKIN, CITY OF
Represented By: RUSSELL A BRITT
Represented By: PEARSON K CUNNINGHAM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SGT MYERS
Represented By: RUSSELL A BRITT
Represented By: PEARSON K CUNNINGHAM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILL HOUSE
Represented By: RUSSELL A BRITT
Represented By: PEARSON K CUNNINGHAM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILLIAM GARY YOCHUM, JR
Represented By: RUSSELL A BRITT
Represented By: PEARSON K CUNNINGHAM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ELIJAH HARVEY
Represented By: KATONGA LANISE WRIGHT HARRIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?