MAROUNFA v. NIELSEN et al
Petitioner: ALI MAROUNFA
Respondent: Warden TERRY JOHNSON, U.S. ATTY GENERAL WILLIAM P. BARR, Captain JAMES RICH, Sec. DHS KIRSTJEN NIELSEN, SEAN GALLAGHER and U.S. ATTY GENERAL WILLIAM BARR
Not Yet Classified: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (NOTICE)
Case Number: 4:2019cv00051
Filed: March 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: STEPHEN HYLES
Referring Judge: CLAY D LAND
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 5, 2019 Filing 13 Mail Returned - #11 Order on Motion to Dismiss, Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction, Order on Amended Motion, Order on Report and Recommendations, #12 Judgment sent to ALI MAROUNFA returned as undeliverable. (esl)
May 23, 2019 Filing 12 JUDGMENT (tlf).
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #8 Amended Motion(); adopting #9 Report and Recommendations. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D. LAND on 5/23/2019 (tlf).
May 20, 2019 Filing 10 Mail Returned - #9 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION sent to petitioner returned as Not at this Facility (tlf).
May 3, 2019 Filing 9 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #5 MOTION to Dismiss Application for Habeas Corpus Relief and Return Response and #8 AMENDED MOTION Amending #5 MOTION to Dismiss Application for Habeas Corpus Relief and Return Response filed by KIRSTJEN NIELSEN, WILLIAM P. BARR, TERRY JOHNSON, JAMES RICH, SEAN GALLAGHER; #7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by ALI MAROUNFA. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES on 5-3-19. (bdd)
April 19, 2019 Filing 8 AMENDED MOTION Amending #5 MOTION to Dismiss Application for Habeas Corpus Relief and Return Response by WILLIAM P. BARR, SEAN GALLAGHER, TERRY JOHNSON, KIRSTJEN NIELSEN, JAMES RICH filed by AMELIA GODFREY HELMICK. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A -- Warrant of Removal/Deportation)(HELMICK, AMELIA)
April 8, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by ALI MAROUNFA. (Attachments: #1 Envelope). Motion referred to US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES(tlf).
April 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER for Response to #5 MOTION to Dismiss Application for Habeas Corpus Relief and Return Response filed by KIRSTJEN NIELSEN, WILLIAM P. BARR, TERRY JOHNSON, JAMES RICH, SEAN GALLAGHER. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES on 4-1-19. (jdl)
April 1, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss Application for Habeas Corpus Relief and Return Response by WILLIAM P. BARR, SEAN GALLAGHER, TERRY JOHNSON, KIRSTJEN NIELSEN, JAMES RICH filed by AMELIA GODFREY HELMICK. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Bond Denial, #2 Exhibit B - BIA Denial, #3 Exhibit C - 11th Circuit Denial of Stay, #4 Exhibit D - Travel Document). Motion(s) referred to STEPHEN HYLES.(HELMICK, AMELIA)
March 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER for Respondents to File Responsive Pleading re: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by ALI MAROUNFA. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES on 3-28-19. (bdd)
March 28, 2019 Filing 3 Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to ALI MAROUNFA (tlf).
March 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Hyles issued at the direction of the Court (tlf).
March 28, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS filed by ALI MAROUNFA against WILLIAM P. BARR, SEAN GALLAGHER, TERRY JOHNSON, KIRSTJEN NIELSEN, and JAMES RICH. Filing fee $5.00, receipt number 42165 (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(tlf).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MAROUNFA v. NIELSEN et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden TERRY JOHNSON
Represented By: AMELIA GODFREY HELMICK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: U.S. ATTY GENERAL WILLIAM P. BARR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Captain JAMES RICH
Represented By: AMELIA GODFREY HELMICK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Sec. DHS KIRSTJEN NIELSEN
Represented By: AMELIA GODFREY HELMICK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: SEAN GALLAGHER
Represented By: AMELIA GODFREY HELMICK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: U.S. ATTY GENERAL WILLIAM BARR
Represented By: AMELIA GODFREY HELMICK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: ALI MAROUNFA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (NOTICE)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?