CHRISTMAS v. HARRIS COUNTY GEORGIA et al
Plaintiff: LYNETTE CHRISTMAS
Defendant: Sheriff ROBERT MICHAEL JOLLEY, THOMAS CARL PIERSON and HARRIS COUNTY GEORGIA
Case Number: 4:2019cv00053
Filed: March 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: CLAY D LAND
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 31, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 29, 2019 Filing 14 REPLY to Response filed by LYNETTE CHRISTMAS re #11 MOTION Lift Stay of Discovery re 9 Order on Motion to Stay, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Sheriff Jolley Deposition Excerpts, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Excerpt from Pierson Trial Transcript)(SEXTON, JONATHAN)
June 19, 2019 Filing 13 RESPONSE filed by HARRIS COUNTY GEORGIA, ROBERT MICHAEL JOLLEY, THOMAS CARL PIERSON re #11 MOTION Lift Stay of Discovery re 9 Order on Motion to Stay, (BRITT, RUSSELL)
June 12, 2019 Filing 12 REPLY to Response filed by HARRIS COUNTY GEORGIA, ROBERT MICHAEL JOLLEY, THOMAS CARL PIERSON re #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (BRITT, RUSSELL)
May 29, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION Lift Stay of Discovery re 9 Order on Motion to Stay, by LYNETTE CHRISTMAS filed by JONATHAN P SEXTON.(SEXTON, JONATHAN)
May 29, 2019 Filing 10 RESPONSE filed by LYNETTE CHRISTMAS re #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Ledger-Enquirer Article, #2 Exhibit B - Jolley Depo, #3 Exhibit C - Bill of Indictment, #4 Exhibit D - GBI Investigative Summary, #5 Exhibit E - Pierson Depo)(SEXTON, JONATHAN)
May 22, 2019 Georgia Attorney Admission Fee Met by PEARSON K CUNNINGHAM (nop)
May 15, 2019 Filing 9 This is a text only entry; no document issued. ORDER granting #7 Motion to Stay. Discovery is stayed pending the Court's ruling on the pending motion to dismiss. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND on 05/15/2019 (CCL)
May 14, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by THOMAS CARL PIERSON with Jury Demand.(WILLIAMS, TERRY)Attorney TERRY E WILLIAMS added to party THOMAS CARL PIERSON(pty:dft)
May 8, 2019 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PEARSON K CUNNINGHAM - Counsel is notified that they do not show in the court records that they meet the required attorney admissions policies of this court. If within 14 days of this notice all requirements, including the payment of admissions fees, have not been met, a show cause hearing may be scheduled (tlf).
May 8, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Stay Proceedings by HARRIS COUNTY GEORGIA, ROBERT MICHAEL JOLLEY, THOMAS CARL PIERSON filed by RUSSELL A BRITT.(BRITT, RUSSELL)
May 8, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by HARRIS COUNTY GEORGIA, ROBERT MICHAEL JOLLEY, THOMAS CARL PIERSON filed by RUSSELL A BRITT. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Their Pre-Answer Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint)(BRITT, RUSSELL)
May 1, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by LYNETTE CHRISTMAS as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proof of Service on Harris County, #2 Exhibit Proof of Service on Sheriff Jolley, #3 Exhibit Proof of Service on Thomas Carl Pierson)(SEXTON, JONATHAN)
March 28, 2019 Filing 4 Summons issued as to THOMAS CARL PIERSON (tlf).
March 28, 2019 Filing 3 Summons issued as to ROBERT MICHAEL JOLLEY (tlf).
March 28, 2019 Filing 2 Summons issued as to HARRIS COUNTY, GEORGIA (tlf).
March 28, 2019 Notice of Deficiency; Related document: #1 Complaint (IFP) filed by LYNETTE CHRISTMAS; Notice to Counsel - Jacob Weldon. Your contact information in CM/ECF is not current. Please login as soon as possible and update your user account via Utilities - Your Account (tlf).
March 28, 2019 Notice of Deficiency; Related document: #1 Complaint (IFP) filed by LYNETTE CHRISTMAS; Parties were added using punctuation AND/OR title capitalization. The case opening guide states ***REMINDER*** all parties must be added using ALL CAPS (ie LISA SMITH or DELTA AIRLINES). Do not use ANY punctuation when adding new parties. For instructions on adding parties, please refer to the Style Guide located on the website for the Middle District of Georgia. No need to re-file(tlf).
March 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (IFP) against Lynette Christmas filed by Lynette Christmas (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(SEXTON, JONATHAN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CHRISTMAS v. HARRIS COUNTY GEORGIA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LYNETTE CHRISTMAS
Represented By: JONATHAN P SEXTON
Represented By: JACOB A WELDON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheriff ROBERT MICHAEL JOLLEY
Represented By: PEARSON K CUNNINGHAM
Represented By: KENNETH DREW JONES
Represented By: RUSSELL A BRITT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THOMAS CARL PIERSON
Represented By: TERRY E WILLIAMS
Represented By: PEARSON K CUNNINGHAM
Represented By: KENNETH DREW JONES
Represented By: RUSSELL A BRITT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HARRIS COUNTY GEORGIA
Represented By: PEARSON K CUNNINGHAM
Represented By: KENNETH DREW JONES
Represented By: RUSSELL A BRITT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?