PERKINS v. MUSCOGEE COUNTY SCHOOL DISTRICT
Plaintiff: BRENDA PERKINS
Defendant: MUSCOGEE COUNTY SCHOOL DISTRICT
Case Number: 4:2019cv00054
Filed: April 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: CLAY D LAND
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2019 Filing 6 RULES 16/26 ORDER:Proposed Scheduling/Discovery order due by 8/14/2019. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND on 7/2/2019. (esl)
July 2, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by MARIEL W SMITH on behalf of MUSCOGEE COUNTY SCHOOL DISTRICT Attorney MARIEL W SMITH added to party MUSCOGEE COUNTY SCHOOL DISTRICT(pty:dft) (SMITH, MARIEL)
May 30, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint by MUSCOGEE COUNTY SCHOOL DISTRICT with Jury Demand.(SLATON, MELANIE)Attorney MELANIE V SLATON added to party MUSCOGEE COUNTY SCHOOL DISTRICT(pty:dft)
April 15, 2019 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by BRENDA PERKINS. as to MUSCOGEE COUNTY SCHOOL DISTRICT (ROPER, JOHN)
April 1, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to MUSCOGEE COUNTY SCHOOL DISTRICT. (esl)
April 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against MUSCOGEE COUNTY SCHOOL DISTRICT Fee paid: Receipt # 113G-3118428, $400 filed by BRENDA PERKINS (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Litigation Hold Notice, #2 Exhibit Verification, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons)(ROPER, JOHN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PERKINS v. MUSCOGEE COUNTY SCHOOL DISTRICT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRENDA PERKINS
Represented By: JOHN W ROPER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MUSCOGEE COUNTY SCHOOL DISTRICT
Represented By: NICHOLAS J GARCIA
Represented By: MARIEL W SMITH
Represented By: MELANIE V SLATON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?