NGASSA v. PETERSON et al
Petitioner: ERNEST HANDOU NGASSA
Respondent: RONALD D VITIELLO, U.S. ATTY GENERAL WILLIAM P. BARR, Director SEAN W GALLAGHER, Sec. DHS KIRSTJEN NIELSEN, Warden CHARLIE PETERSON and U.S. ATTY GENERAL WILLIAM BARR
Not Yet Classified: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (NOTICE)
Case Number: 4:2019cv00055
Filed: April 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: STEPHEN HYLES
Referring Judge: CLAY D LAND
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 23, 2019 Filing 10 BRIEF in reply to Respondents' Response to Petition for a Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by ERNEST HANDOU NGASSA re #9 RESPONSE in Opposition - Unrelated to a Motion,, (TOUSLEY, THOMAS)
May 8, 2019 Filing 9 RESPONSE in Opposition re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus,,,, (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Andrade Declaration, #2 Exhibit A -- I-213, #3 Exhibit B -- NTA, #4 Exhibit C -- Parole Denial, #5 Exhibit D -- IJ Decision Sept 2017, #6 Exhibit E -- Briefing Extension, #7 Exhibit F -- BIA Decision March 2018, #8 Exhibit G -- Remand, #9 Exhibit H -- BIA Decision Sept 2018, #10 Exhibit I -- IJ Decision Feb 2019, #11 Exhibit J -- Briefing Schedule)(HELMICK, AMELIA)
April 24, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE Proof of Admission Pro Hac Vice by ERNEST HANDOU NGASSA (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proof of Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit Proof of payment of Pro Hac Vice Admissions Fee)(TOUSLEY, THOMAS)
April 24, 2019 SECOND NOTICE TO COUNSEL THOMAS HARRY TOUSLEY - Counsel is notified that they do not show in the court records that they meet the required attorney admissions policies of this court. If within 14 days of this notice all requirements, including the payment of Pro Hac Vice or admissions fees, have not been met, a show cause hearing will be scheduled. (nop)
April 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER setting briefing schedule re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by ERNEST HANDOU NGASSA. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES on 4-8-19. (bdd)
April 8, 2019 Filing 6 RETURN RESPONSE re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus,,,, filed by WILLIAM P. BARR, SEAN W GALLAGHER, KIRSTJEN NIELSEN, CHARLIE PETERSON, RONALD D VITIELLO (HELMICK, AMELIA)
April 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER for Respondents to File Responsive Pleading re: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by ERNEST HANDOU NGASSA. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES on 4-3-19. (bdd)
April 3, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by HELEN LOUISE PARSONAGE on behalf of ERNEST HANDOU NGASSA (PARSONAGE, HELEN)
April 3, 2019 Filing 3 Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to ERNEST HANDOU NGASSA (tlf).
April 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Hyles issued at the direction of the Court (tlf).
April 3, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUSagainst All Plaintiffs Fee paid: Receipt # 113G-3120798, $5 filed by Ernest Handou Ngassa (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Habeas Corpus Alien Detainee, #2 Exhibit Credible Fear Worksheet, #3 Exhibit Notice to Appear, #4 Exhibit Second Request for Release from Custody, #5 Exhibit Notification Declining to Grant Parole, #6 Exhibit Master Calendar Hearing June 7, 2017, #7 Exhibit Pelletier Decision (redacted), #8 Exhibit BIA March 7, 2018 Decision, #9 Exhibit 11th Circuit Grant of Stay, #10 Exhibit Joint Motion to Remand, #11 Exhibit 11th Circuit Grant of Joint Motion to Remand, #12 Exhibit Third Request for Release from Custody, #13 Exhibit Follow Up Letter to ICE Field Office Director, #14 Exhibit Follow Up Letter to ICE Deportation Officer, #15 Exhibit BIA September 27, 2018 Remand, #16 Exhibit Duncan Decision (redacted), #17 Exhibit BIA Filing Receipt, #18 Exhibit ICE DO Email, #19 Exhibit Stewart Detention Center Overview)(TOUSLEY, THOMAS)
April 3, 2019 Notice of Deficiency; Related document: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by ERNEST HANDOU NGASSA; Parties were added using punctuation AND/OR title capitalization. The case opening guide states ***REMINDER*** all parties must be added using ALL CAPS (ie LISA SMITH or DELTA AIRLINES). Do not use ANY punctuation when adding new parties. For instructions on adding parties, please refer to the Style Guide located on the website for the Middle District of Georgia. Additionally, parties were not added user the correct party types of petitioner and respondents, the incorrect county was selected, and the wrong cause of action was selected. Corrected by case manager, no need to re-file (tlf).
April 3, 2019 NOTICE TO COUNSEL THOMAS HARRY TOUSLEY - Counsel is notified that they do not show in the court records that they meet the required attorney admissions policies of this court. If within 14 days of this notice all requirements, including the payment of Pro Hac Vice admissions fees, have not been met, a show cause hearing may be scheduled (tlf).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NGASSA v. PETERSON et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: RONALD D VITIELLO
Represented By: AMELIA GODFREY HELMICK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: U.S. ATTY GENERAL WILLIAM P. BARR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Director SEAN W GALLAGHER
Represented By: AMELIA GODFREY HELMICK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Sec. DHS KIRSTJEN NIELSEN
Represented By: AMELIA GODFREY HELMICK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden CHARLIE PETERSON
Represented By: AMELIA GODFREY HELMICK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: U.S. ATTY GENERAL WILLIAM BARR
Represented By: AMELIA GODFREY HELMICK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (NOTICE)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: ERNEST HANDOU NGASSA
Represented By: HELEN LOUISE PARSONAGE
Represented By: THOMAS HARRY TOUSLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?