ELLIS vs. WARREN
Plaintiff: Reverand WILLIAM L ELLIS, SR
Defendant: Dr Wayne Warren
Case Number: 4:2019cv00067
Filed: April 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: STEPHEN HYLES
Referring Judge: CLAY D LAND
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 42:12182
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 10, 2019 Filing 9 BRIEF filed by WILLIAM L ELLIS, SR re #1 Complaint (Attachments: #1 Returned Mail, #2 Envelope)(tlf).
June 3, 2019 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM in Support of #1 Complaint (Attachments: #1 Notice of Trespass Upon Eight Amendment, #2 Notice of Lien, #3 Notice of Incorporation by Reference, #4 Envelope)(esl)
May 7, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF CONSENT by WILLIAM L ELLIS, SR re #3 Consent to Proceed Form Sent (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(esl)
May 6, 2019 Filing 5 EXHIBIT(S) by WILLIAM L ELLIS, SR re #1 Complaint (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(esl)
May 3, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Filed by WILLIAM L ELLIS, SR. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Envelope). Motion referred to STEPHEN HYLES.(esl)
April 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER directing Plaintiff to either pay the required filing fee or apply for IFP status within fourteen (14) days, and directing the Clerk to send Plaintiff required forms. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES on 4-24-19. (bdd)
April 23, 2019 Filing 3 Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to WILLIAM L ELLIS, SR (esl)
April 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER REFERRING CASE to US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES issued at the direction of the Court. (esl)
April 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Wayne Warren, filed by WILLIAM L ELLIS, SR.. Filing Fee NOT PAID. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Envelope)(esl) Modified on 4/23/2019 (esl).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ELLIS vs. WARREN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr Wayne Warren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reverand WILLIAM L ELLIS, SR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?