KAI-LEWIS v. BARR et al
Petitioner: EDWINE KAI-LEWIS
Respondent: RONALD D VITIELLO, MICHAEL J DONAHUE, U.S. ATTY GENERAL WILLIAM P. BARR, SEAN GALLAGHER, KEVIN K MCALEENAN and U.S. ATTY GENERAL WILLIAM BARR
Not Yet Classified: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (NOTICE)
Case Number: 4:2019cv00071
Filed: April 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: STEPHEN HYLES
Referring Judge: CLAY D LAND
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 13, 2019 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to #9 RESPONSE in Opposition - Unrelated to a Motion (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - 6 - Immigration Documents, #2 Envelope)(tlf). (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/17/2019: #3 Rescanned pages 4 and 6 of petitioner's exhibits) (tlf).
May 29, 2019 Filing 9 RESPONSE in Opposition re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of DO Leon Shaw and Supporting Documents)(SHOEMAKER, BOWEN)
May 23, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by WILLIAM BARR, MICHAEL J DONAHUE, SEAN GALLAGHER, KEVIN K MCALEENAN, RONALD D VITIELLO re Notice of Deficiency, (SHOEMAKER, BOWEN)
May 22, 2019 Notice of Deficiency; Related document: #5 Motion for Leave to File filed by MICHAEL J DONAHUE, KEVIN K MCALEENAN, RONALD D VITIELLO, WILLIAM BARR, SEAN GALLAGHER; Certificate of Service indicates a physical address. Petitioner's pleadings indicate a PO Box. Please re-send the document to the PO Box and file a certificate of serving indicating that this was accomplished (tlf).
May 22, 2019 REMARK: Kai-Lewis called the clerk's office requesting that all mail be sent to the PO BOX as reflected on the docket and all of his mail (EDWINE KAI-LEWIS, A 070140253, STEWART DETENTION CENTER, PO BOX 248, LUMPKIN, GA 31815). The Certificate of Service for document #5 indicates a copy was mailed to the physical address (146 CCA Road) and petitioner said he has yet to receive the filing. He asks that respondent mail another copy to the PO BOX address as he does not have the funds to pay for copies from the clerk's office. (esl)
May 16, 2019 Filing 7 Letter from petitioner requesting a copy of docker sheet. Docket sheet with a note that future copies will cost 50 cents per page sent (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(tlf).
April 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Leave to File and setting briefing schedule re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by EDWINE KAI-LEWIS. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES on 4-30-19. (bdd)
April 30, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to File Out-of-Time Return by WILLIAM P. BARR, MICHAEL J DONAHUE, SEAN GALLAGHER, KEVIN K MCALEENAN, RONALD D VITIELLO filed by BOWEN REICHERT SHOEMAKER. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Return). Motion(s) referred to STEPHEN HYLES.(SHOEMAKER, BOWEN)
April 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER for Respondent to File Responsive Pleading re: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by EDWINE KAI-LEWIS. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES on 4-26-19. (bdd)
April 25, 2019 Filing 3 Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to EDWINE KAI-LEWIS (esl)
April 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge issued at the direction of the Court. (esl)
April 25, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS ( Filing fee $ 5 Receipt number 42168), filed by EDWINE KAI-LEWIS. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(esl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KAI-LEWIS v. BARR et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: RONALD D VITIELLO
Represented By: BOWEN REICHERT SHOEMAKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: MICHAEL J DONAHUE
Represented By: BOWEN REICHERT SHOEMAKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: U.S. ATTY GENERAL WILLIAM P. BARR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: SEAN GALLAGHER
Represented By: BOWEN REICHERT SHOEMAKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: KEVIN K MCALEENAN
Represented By: BOWEN REICHERT SHOEMAKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: U.S. ATTY GENERAL WILLIAM BARR
Represented By: BOWEN REICHERT SHOEMAKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: EDWINE KAI-LEWIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (NOTICE)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?