AUTO-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY v. WAYNE FRIER HOME CENTER OF BYRON, LLC et al
Plaintiff: AUTO-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY
Defendant: WMT HOUSING LLC, MARY ANN ARMIJO, DONALD MASON and WAYNE FRIER HOME CENTER OF BYRON LLC
Case Number: 4:2019cv00095
Filed: June 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: CLAY D LAND
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 1, 2019 Filing 18 RULES 16/26 ORDER: Proposed Scheduling/Discovery order due by 9/12/2019. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D. LAND on 8/1/2019 (tlf).
July 31, 2019 Filing 17 ANSWER to Complaint by WAYNE FRIER HOME CENTER OF BYRON LLC, WMT HOUSING LLC.(SNIPES, ALAN)
July 16, 2019 Filing 16 Corporate Disclosure Statement by WAYNE FRIER HOME CENTER OF BYRON LLC, WMT HOUSING LLC (SNIPES, ALAN)
July 10, 2019 Notice of Deficiency; Pursuant to Local Rule 87.1, all nongovernmental corporate parties must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement. Additionally, pursuant to Local Rule 87.2 a Jurisdictional Statement must be filed. Please file the required statements immediately (tlf).
July 10, 2019 Notice of Deficiency; Related documents: #15 Stipulation and #14 Notice of Attorney Appearance; Notice to Counsel - Alan G. Snipes. Your contact information in CM/ECF is not current. Please update your contact information via PACER (tlf).
July 10, 2019 Filing 15 STIPULATION Extending Time to Respond to Complaint by WAYNE FRIER HOME CENTER OF BYRON LLC, WMT HOUSING LLC (SNIPES, ALAN)
July 10, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by ALAN G SNIPES on behalf of WAYNE FRIER HOME CENTER OF BYRON LLC, WMT HOUSING LLC Attorney ALAN G SNIPES added to party WAYNE FRIER HOME CENTER OF BYRON LLC(pty:dft), Attorney ALAN G SNIPES added to party WMT HOUSING LLC(pty:dft) (SNIPES, ALAN)
July 1, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by AUTO-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY as to WAYNE FRIER HOME CENTER OF BYRON LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A Proof of Service)(KAHREN, MELISSA)
July 1, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by AUTO-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY as to WMT HOUSING LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A Proof of Service)(KAHREN, MELISSA)
June 19, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by AUTO-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY as to MARY ANN ARMIJO. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A Affidavit of Service)(KAHREN, MELISSA)
June 19, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by AUTO-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY as to DONALD MASON. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A Affidavit of Service)(KAHREN, MELISSA)
June 19, 2019 Notice of Deficiency; Documents must be re-filed; Related documents: #9 Notice (Other) filed by AUTO-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY and #8 Notice (Other) filed by AUTO-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY; Document must be re-filed using correct event which is Civil Events, Initial Pleadings and Service, Service of Process, Summons Returned Executed (tlf).
June 19, 2019 Filing 9 Replaced by D.E. #11 . NOTICE of Filing Affidavit of Service by AUTO-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A Affidavit of Service)(KAHREN, MELISSA) Modified on 6/19/2019 (tlf).
June 19, 2019 Filing 8 Replaced by D.E. #10 . NOTICE Notice of Filing Affidavit of Service by AUTO-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A Affidavit of Service)(KAHREN, MELISSA) Modified on 6/19/2019 (tlf).
June 17, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by AUTO-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY identifying Corporate Parent Home-Owners Insurance Company, Corporate Parent PROPERTY-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY, Corporate Parent Southern-Owners Insurance Company, Corporate Parent AUTO-OWNERS LIFE INSURANCE, Corporate Parent AUTO-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY for AUTO-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY. (KAHREN, MELISSA)
June 17, 2019 Filing 6 Jurisdictional Statement by AUTO-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY (KAHREN, MELISSA)
June 14, 2019 Filing 5 Summons issued as to WMT HOUSING, LLC (tlf).
June 14, 2019 Filing 4 Summons issued as to WAYNE FRIER HOME CENTER OF BYRON, LLC (tlf).
June 14, 2019 Filing 3 Summons issued as to DONALD MASON (tlf).
June 14, 2019 Filing 2 Summons issued as to MARY ANN ARMIJO (tlf).
June 14, 2019 Notice of Deficiency; Related document: #1 Complaint, filed by AUTO-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY; Each summons should have been attached separately not all clumped together (tlf).
June 14, 2019 Notice of Deficiency; Related document(s): #1 Complaint,, filed by AUTO-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY; Pursuant to Local Rule 87.2 a Jurisdictional Statement must be filed (tlf).
June 14, 2019 Notice of Deficiency; Related document(s): #1 Complaint,, filed by AUTO-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY; Pursuant to Local Rule 87.1, all nongovernmental corporate parties must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement. Please file the required corporate disclosures immediately (tlf).
June 14, 2019 Notice of Deficiency; No need to re-file. Corrected by case manager; Related document: #1 Complaint,, filed by AUTO-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY; Parties were added using punctuation AND/OR title capitalization. The case opening guide states ***REMINDER*** all parties must be added using ALL CAPS (ie LISA SMITH or DELTA AIRLINES). Do not use ANY punctuation when adding new parties. For instructions on adding parties, please refer to the Style Guide located on the website for the Middle District of Georgia (tlf).
June 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against MARY ANN ARMIJO, DONALD MASON, WAYNE FRIER HOME CENTER OF BYRON, LLC, WMT HOUSING, LLC Fee paid: Receipt # AGAMDC-3187356, $400 filed by AUTO-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 Amended Complaint, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3 Policy, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4 Reservation of Rights letter, #5 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Summons Summons of Donald Mason, Wayne Frier Home Center of Byron, LLC, Mary Ann Armijo, WMT Housing, LLC)(KAHREN, MELISSA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AUTO-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY v. WAYNE FRIER HOME CENTER OF BYRON, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WMT HOUSING LLC
Represented By: ALAN G SNIPES
Represented By: TYLER CARR CASHBAUGH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARY ANN ARMIJO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DONALD MASON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WAYNE FRIER HOME CENTER OF BYRON LLC
Represented By: ALAN G SNIPES
Represented By: TYLER CARR CASHBAUGH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AUTO-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: MARK T DIETRICHS
Represented By: MELISSA KAYE KAHREN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?