DANIELS v. COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Plaintiff: ELIZABETH IRENE DANIELS
Defendant: COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Not Yet Classified: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION (NOTICE)
Case Number: 4:2019cv00107
Filed: July 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: STEPHEN HYLES
Referring Judge: CLAY D LAND
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 17, 2019 Filing 14 This is a text only entry; no document issued. ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES for all further proceedings. Judge US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND no longer assigned to case(tlf).
July 17, 2019 Filing 13 Consent to proceed before a full-time U.S. Magistrate Judge in accordance with the terms and conditions set forth in 28 U.S.C 636(c)(1) and (2) (OSTERHOUT, KARL)
July 16, 2019 Filing 12 USM 285 Process Receipt and Return executed for COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY (tlf).
July 15, 2019 Filing 11 USM 285 Process Receipt and Return executed for SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION (NOTICE) (tlf).
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Order granting Petition for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Petition Attached); Attorney Admission Fee Met by KARL E OSTERHOUT (nop)
July 9, 2019 Filing 9 PETITION TO THE CLERK FOR ADMISSION TO PLEAD AND PRACTICE PRO HAC VICE by ELIZABETH IRENE DANIELS Attorney Admission Fee (Pro Hac Vice) paid by Receipt # AGAMDC-3206601, $100 (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(OSTERHOUT, KARL)
July 5, 2019 Filing 8 USM 285 Process Receipt and Return MAILED for COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY (tlp)
July 2, 2019 Filing 7 Summonses issued as to COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY, U.S. Attorney, and U.S. Attorney General (tlf).
July 2, 2019 Filing 6 USMs 285 issued as to COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY, U.S. Attorney. and U.S. Attorney General (tlf). Modified on 7/2/2019 (tlf).
July 2, 2019 Filing 5 This is a text only entry; no document issued. ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and directing service by the United States Marshals Service. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES on 7-2-19 (jdl)
July 2, 2019 Filing 4 Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to ELIZABETH IRENE DANIELS (tlf).
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Hyles issued at the direction of the Court (tlf).
July 2, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by ELIZABETH IRENE DANIELS filed by KATHLEEN MARIE FLYNN. (Attachments: #1 USM 285, #2 USM 285, #3 USM 285, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons). Motion(s) referred to STEPHEN HYLES.(FLYNN, KATHLEEN)
July 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (IFP) against COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY filed by ELIZABETH IRENE DANIELS (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(FLYNN, KATHLEEN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DANIELS v. COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION (NOTICE)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ELIZABETH IRENE DANIELS
Represented By: KATHLEEN MARIE FLYNN
Represented By: KARL E OSTERHOUT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?