MAHDI v. BARR et al

Petitioner: MAHDI MAHDI SALIH MAHDI
Respondent: WILLIAM BARR, KEVIN K MCALEENAN, WARDEN MICHAEL DONAHUE and Field Ofc Director KEVIN RIDDLE
Not Yet Classified: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (NOTICE)
Case Number: 4:2019cv00109
Filed: July 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: STEPHEN HYLES
Referring Judge: CLAY D LAND
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 28, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Change of Address (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(esl)
August 22, 2019 Filing 14 This is a text only entry; no document issued. ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Respondents shall respond within thirty (30) days. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES on 8-22-19. (rcg)
August 21, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by WILLIAM BARR, MICHAEL DONAHUE, KEVIN K MCALEENAN, KEVIN RIDDLE filed by AMELIA G HELMICK.. Motion(s) referred to STEPHEN HYLES.(HELMICK, AMELIA)
August 5, 2019 Filing 12 This is a text only entry; no document issued. ORDER denying as moot #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES on 8-5-19. (jdl)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER setting briefing schedule. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES on 7-23-19. (jdl)
July 23, 2019 Filing 10 RETURN RESPONSE re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by WILLIAM BARR, MICHAEL DONAHUE, KEVIN K MCALEENAN, KEVIN RIDDLE (HELMICK, AMELIA)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER for Respondent to File Responsive Pleading re: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by MAHDI MAHDI SALIH MAHDI. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES on 7-22-19. (jdl)
July 19, 2019 Filing 8 Filing fee Paid: Habeas $5.00 (Hand Receipt # 42260) (esl) (esl).
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER to submit motion to proceed IFP in proper form, including a certified copy of trust account statement. The Clerk is directed to provide Petitioner with the appropriate forms. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES on 7-8-19. (jdl)
July 5, 2019 Filing 6 Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to MAHDI MAHDI SALIH MAHDI (tlp)
July 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge issued at the direction of the Court. (tlp)
July 5, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Order for Temporary Restraining Order - Filed by MAHDI MAHDI SALIH MAHDI. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order - TRO). Motion(s) referred to STEPHEN HYLES.(tlp)
July 5, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel - Filed by MAHDI MAHDI SALIH MAHDI.. Motion(s) referred to STEPHEN HYLES.(tlp)
July 5, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis - Filed by MAHDI MAHDI SALIH MAHDI.. Motion(s) referred to STEPHEN HYLES.(tlp)
July 5, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS - filed by MAHDI MAHDI SALIH MAHDI. (Attachments: #1 Immigration Documents, #2 Cover Letter, #3 Envelope 1, #4 Envelope 2)(tlp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MAHDI v. BARR et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: WILLIAM BARR
Represented By: AMELIA G HELMICK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: KEVIN K MCALEENAN
Represented By: AMELIA G HELMICK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: WARDEN MICHAEL DONAHUE
Represented By: AMELIA G HELMICK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Field Ofc Director KEVIN RIDDLE
Represented By: AMELIA G HELMICK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: MAHDI MAHDI SALIH MAHDI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (NOTICE)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?