SNEED v. DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS, et al.
Plaintiff: JAMES EARL SNEED, SR
Defendant: VETERAN'S AFFAIRS MEDICAL CENTER, CENTRAL ALABAMA VETERAN'S HEALTH CARE SYSTEM and DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS
Case Number: 4:2019cv00143
Filed: August 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: CLAY D LAND
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1402
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2019 Filing 5 Summons reissued as to CENTRAL ALABAMA VETERAN'S HEALTH CARE SYSTEM (tlf).
September 17, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (esl)
September 9, 2019 Filing fee Paid: IFP Denied $400.00 (esl)
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER denying #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff must pay the required filing fee within fourteen (14) days. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES on 8-29-19. (rcg)
August 28, 2019 #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis referred to US Magistrate Judge STEPHEN HYLES (tlf).
August 28, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by JAMES EARL SNEED SR.(tlf).
August 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by JAMES EARL SNEED SR. against CENTRAL ALABAMA VETERAN'S HEALTH CARE SYSTEM, DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS, and VETERAN'S AFFAIRS MEDICAL CENTER (tlf).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SNEED v. DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VETERAN'S AFFAIRS MEDICAL CENTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CENTRAL ALABAMA VETERAN'S HEALTH CARE SYSTEM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES EARL SNEED, SR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?