SMITH et al v. HARBISON et al
Plaintiff: DAVAUN COTTEN, KA CO and KETERIA SMITH
Defendant: MD KAMESHA HHARBISON, RNC KELLY MCNANY, RN CAITLYN DOWNS, VALLEY HEALTHCARE SYSTEM INC, ST FRANCIS HEALTH LLC and LIFEPOINT HEALTH INC
Case Number: 4:2019cv00152
Filed: September 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: CLAY D LAND
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:2671
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 4, 2019 Notice of Clerk's Granting of Extension Pursuant to Local Rule 6.2 re: #21 MOTION to Remand filed by DAVAUN COTTEN, KA CO, KETERIA SMITH (tlp)
November 1, 2019 Filing 23 Letter regarding Extension of Time (FREEDUS, MATTHEW)
October 16, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Opposition to Notice of Removal by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (SHOEMAKER, BOWEN)
October 16, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION to Remand by KA CO, DAVAUN COTTEN, KETERIA SMITH filed by NICOLE T MATTEO. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Memo of Law In Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand, #2 Exhibit Notice to State Court Pursuant to 42 USC 233, #3 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service for Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand)(MATTEO, NICOLE)
October 16, 2019 Notice of Deficiency: #20 Motion to Remand, filed by DAVAUN COTTEN, KA CO, KETERIA SMITH ). Document must be converted into text-searchable PDF format and re-filed. (tlp)
October 15, 2019 Filing 20 REFILED - SEE ECF NO. 21. MOTION to Remand by KA CO, DAVAUN COTTEN, KETERIA SMITH filed by NICOLE T MATTEO. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Memo of Law in Support, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)(MATTEO, NICOLE) Modified on 10/17/2019 (tlp).
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Order granting Petition for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Petition Attached); Attorney Admission Fee Met by PAUL D BRANDES, PETER M VILLARI, NICOLE T MATTEO, THERESA LYNN GIANNONE (Attachments: #1 PHV admission, #2 PHV admission, #3 PHV admission) (nop)
September 30, 2019 Filing 18 PETITION TO THE CLERK FOR ADMISSION TO PLEAD AND PRACTICE PRO HAC VICE by KA CO, DAVAUN COTTEN, KETERIA SMITH Attorney Admission Fee (Pro Hac Vice) paid by Receipt # AGAMDC-3276134, $100 (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing Cert of Good Standing)(BRANDES, PAUL)
September 30, 2019 Filing 17 PETITION TO THE CLERK FOR ADMISSION TO PLEAD AND PRACTICE PRO HAC VICE by KA CO, DAVAUN COTTEN, KETERIA SMITH Attorney Admission Fee (Pro Hac Vice) paid by Receipt # AGAMDC-3276121, $100 (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing Cert of Good Standing)(VILLARI, PETER)
September 30, 2019 Filing 16 PETITION TO THE CLERK FOR ADMISSION TO PLEAD AND PRACTICE PRO HAC VICE by KA CO, DAVAUN COTTEN, KETERIA SMITH Attorney Admission Fee (Pro Hac Vice) paid by Receipt # AGAMDC-3276107, $100 (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing Cert of Good Standing)(MATTEO, NICOLE)
September 30, 2019 Filing 15 PETITION TO THE CLERK FOR ADMISSION TO PLEAD AND PRACTICE PRO HAC VICE by KA CO, DAVAUN COTTEN, KETERIA SMITH Attorney Admission Fee (Pro Hac Vice) paid by Receipt # AGAMDC-3276082, $100 (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(GIANNONE, THERESA)
September 24, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE Amended Notice of Removal to Federal Court by KAMESHA HARBISON, VALLEY HEALTHCARE SYSTEM INC re #1 Notice of Removal,, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Muscogee State Court Filings part 1, #2 Exhibit Muscogee State Court Filings part 2, #3 Exhibit Muscogee State Court Filings part 3, #4 Exhibit Muscogee State Court Filings part 4, #5 Exhibit Muscogee State Court Filings part 5, #6 Exhibit Muscogee State Court Filings part 6)(FRISCH, ERIC)[ Modified on 10/17/2019 (tlp) - to identify order dismissing Lifepoint at 14-3 p75.]
September 23, 2019 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ST FRANCIS HEALTH LLC identifying Corporate Parent LIFEPOINT HEALTH INC, Corporate Parent LIFEPOINT HOSPITALS HOLDINGS LLC, Corporate Parent HISTORIC LIFEPOINT HOSPITALS LLC, Corporate Parent LEGACY LIFEPOINT HEALTH INC, Corporate Parent LIFEPOINT HOLDINGS 2 LLC for ST FRANCIS HEALTH LLC. (DIMITRI, LAUREN)
September 23, 2019 Notice of Deficiency; Document must be re-filed; Related document: #11 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by ST FRANCIS HEALTH LLC; Document must be re-filed to add corporate parents, subsidiary corporations and/or any publicly held corporation that owns 10% or more of its stock to the case. The CM/ECF procedures manual provides as follows: "Document must be re-filed to add corporate parents, subsidiary corporations and/or any publicly held corporation that owns 10% or more of its stock to the case, during the filing process in CM/ECF. It is not sufficient to simply have them listed on the document attached, they must also be entered into CM/ECF. During the filing process, the following user message appeared: "Corporate disclosures statement must be filed with any corporate parents, subsidiary corporations, and/or any publicly held corporation that owns 10% or more of its stock added in CM/ECF during the filing of the document. Failure to add the corporate parents and/or any publicly held corporation identified in your corporate disclosure statement will result in a request to re-file" (tlf).
September 20, 2019 Filing 12 Jurisdictional Statement by ST FRANCIS HEALTH LLC (DIMITRI, LAUREN)
September 20, 2019 Filing 11 REFILED AS ECF NO. 13 . Corporate Disclosure Statement by ST FRANCIS HEALTH LLC (DIMITRI, LAUREN) Modified on 10/17/2019 (tlp).
September 20, 2019 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement AND Jurisdictional Statement by KAMESHA HARBISON, VALLEY HEALTHCARE SYSTEM INC (FRISCH, ERIC)
September 19, 2019 Notice of Deficiency/NEED TO FILE: Pursuant to Local Rule 87.1, all nongovernmental corporate parties must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement; Pursuant to Local Rule 87.2 a Jurisdictional Statement must be filed. Please file the required documents immediately. (tlp)
September 19, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF CONSENT FOR REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT by CAITLYN DOWNS, KELLY MCNANY, ST FRANCIS HEALTH LLC (DIMITRI, LAUREN)
September 19, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by LAUREN K DIMITRI on behalf of CAITLYN DOWNS, KELLY MCNANY, ST FRANCIS HEALTH LLC Attorney LAUREN K DIMITRI added to party CAITLYN DOWNS(pty:dft), Attorney LAUREN K DIMITRI added to party KELLY MCNANY(pty:dft), Attorney LAUREN K DIMITRI added to party ST FRANCIS HEALTH LLC(pty:dft) (DIMITRI, LAUREN)
September 19, 2019 Filing 7 SECOND AMENDED NOTICE OF REMOVAL to Federal Court , amending #1 Notice of Removal and #2 Amended Notice of Removal by KAMESHA HARBISON, VALLEY HEALTHCARE SYSTEM INC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Answer of St. Francis Health, Caitlyn Downs and Kelly McNany)(FRISCH, ERIC) Modified on 9/19/2019 (tlp) - docket text clarification
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order granting Petition for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Petition Attached); Attorney Admission Fee Met by NOORI ALI (nop)
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order granting Petition for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Petition Attached); Attorney Admission Fee Met by MATTHEW S FREEDUS (nop)
September 18, 2019 Filing 4 PETITION TO THE CLERK FOR ADMISSION TO PLEAD AND PRACTICE PRO HAC VICE by KAMESHA HARBISON, VALLEY HEALTHCARE SYSTEM INC Attorney Admission Fee (Pro Hac Vice) paid by Receipt # AGAMDC-3267099, $100 (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing Certificate of Good Standing - Noori Ali)(FRISCH, ERIC)
September 18, 2019 Filing 3 PETITION TO THE CLERK FOR ADMISSION TO PLEAD AND PRACTICE PRO HAC VICE by KAMESHA HARBISON, VALLEY HEALTHCARE SYSTEM INC Attorney Admission Fee (Pro Hac Vice) paid by Receipt # AGAMDC-3267091, $100 (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing Certificate of Good Standing - Matthew Freedus)(FRISCH, ERIC)
September 18, 2019 Filing 2 AMENDED NOTICE OF REMOVAL to Federal Court, amending #1 Notice of Removal by KAMESHA HARBISON, VALLEY HEALTHCARE SYSTEM INC re #1 Notice of Removal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Answer of Valley Healthcare, #2 Exhibit Amended Answer of Valley Healthcare, #3 Exhibit Answer and Jury Demand of Kamesha Harbison, M.D., #4 Exhibit Amended Answer of Kamesha Harbison, M.D.)(FRISCH, ERIC)
September 18, 2019 NOTICE TO COUNSEL MATTHEW S FREEDUS, NOORI ALI - Counsel is notified that they do not show in the court records that they meet the required attorney admissions policies of this court. If within 14 days of this notice all requirements, including the payment of Pro Hac Vice or admissions fees, have not been met, a show cause hearing will be scheduled. (tlp)
September 18, 2019 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PETER M VILLARI, NICOLE T MATTEO - Counsel is notified that they do not show in the court records that they meet the required attorney admissions policies of this court. If within 14 days of this notice all requirements, including the payment of Pro Hac Vice or admissions fees, have not been met, a show cause hearing will be scheduled. (tlp)
September 16, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL - Fee paid: Receipt # AGAMDC-3264147, $400 filed by KAMESHA HARBISON, VALLEY HEALTHCARE SYSTEM INC (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - NDA, #3 Exhibit B - Employment Agreement, #4 Exhibit C - State Court Summons and Complaint, #5 Exhibit D - Dept. of Health & Human Services Letter, #6 Exhibit E - Email from Dept. of Health & Human Services, #7 Exhibit F - Notice to State Court)(FRISCH, ERIC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SMITH et al v. HARBISON et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MD KAMESHA HHARBISON
Represented By: ERIC J FRISCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RNC KELLY MCNANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RN CAITLYN DOWNS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VALLEY HEALTHCARE SYSTEM INC
Represented By: ERIC J FRISCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ST FRANCIS HEALTH LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LIFEPOINT HEALTH INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAVAUN COTTEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KA CO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KETERIA SMITH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?