ESHIET v. DONAHUE
Petitioner: EKONG BEN ESHIET
Respondent: WARDEN MICHAEL DONAHUE
Not Yet Classified: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (NOTICE)
Case Number: 4:2019cv00155
Filed: September 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: STEPHEN HYLES
Referring Judge: CLAY D LAND
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 31, 2019 Filing 15 Letter from petitioner opposing #13 RESPONSE (Attachments: #1 Immigration Documents, #2 Envelope) (tlf).
October 29, 2019 Filing 14 Letter from petitioner (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(tlf).
October 23, 2019 Filing 13 RESPONSE in Support re #10 RETURN RESPONSE (28:2241), #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Carlos Santiago, Deportation Officer, #2 Exhibit A - Form I-213, #3 Exhibit B - Notice to Appear, #4 Exhibit C - Order of the Immigration Judge, #5 Exhibit D - Board Decision)(HELMICK, AMELIA)
October 9, 2019 Filing 12 Letter from petitioner regarding payment of filing fee (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(tlf).
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER setting briefing schedule. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES on 10-7-19. (rcg)
October 7, 2019 Filing 10 RETURN RESPONSE re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by MICHAEL DONAHUE (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Order of Immigration Judge, #2 Exhibit B - Order of Board of Immigration Appeals, #3 Exhibit C - 11th Circuit Court of Appeals Order) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Order of Immigration Judge, #2 Exhibit B - Order of Board of Immigration Appeals, #3 Exhibit C - 11th Circuit Court of Appeals Order)(HELMICK, AMELIA)
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER for Respondent to File Responsive Pleading re: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES on 10-4-19. (rcg)
October 4, 2019 Habeas fling fee of $5.00 paid (tlf).
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER denying #7 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Petitioner must pay the filing fee within twenty-one (21) days. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES on 10-2-19. (rcg)
September 30, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by EKONG BEN ESHIET (Attachments: #1 Trust Account Statement, #2 Envelope). Motion referred to US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES (tlf).
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER denying #4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Petitioner must pay the filing fee within twenty-one (21) days. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES on 9-25-19. (rcg)
September 23, 2019 Filing 5 EXHIBITS by EKONG BEN ESHIET re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter) (tlf).
September 23, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by EKONG BEN ESHIET. (Attachments: #1 Trust Account Statement, #2 Envelope). Motion referred to US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES (tlf).
September 19, 2019 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by EKONG BEN ESHIET ); You must either pay the filing fee or submit a properly completed Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis within 21 days from the date of this notice. Failure to comply with this notice may result in dismissal by the court. An Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit are enclosed. (tlp)
September 19, 2019 Filing 3 Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to EKONG BEN ESHIET (tlp)
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge issued at the direction of the Court. (tlp)
September 19, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS filed by EKONG BEN ESHIET against MICHAEL DONAHUE (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope)(tlp) Modified on 9/19/2019 (tlp) - Filing Fee NOT PAID.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ESHIET v. DONAHUE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: EKONG BEN ESHIET
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: WARDEN MICHAEL DONAHUE
Represented By: AMELIA G HELMICK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (NOTICE)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?