HERODE v. DONAHUE
Petitioner: JULIEN HERODE
Respondent: WARDEN MICHAEL DONAHUE
Not Yet Classified: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (NOTICE)
Case Number: 4:2019cv00181
Filed: October 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: STEPHEN HYLES
Referring Judge: CLAY D LAND
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 16, 2019 Filing 9 Mail Returned - #6 Order sent to petitioner returned as Not at this Facility (tlf).
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER directing Respondent to provide documentation reflecting Petitioner's removal within fourteen (14) days. REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #7 MOTION to Dismiss Petition filed by MICHAEL DONAHUE. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES on 12-16-19. (jdl)
December 13, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss Petition by MICHAEL DONAHUE filed by AMELIA G HELMICK. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Deportation Officer Hartsfield). Motion(s) referred to STEPHEN HYLES.(HELMICK, AMELIA)
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER notifying Petitioner of #5 Motion to Dismiss. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES on 12-3-19. (rcg)
November 1, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss petitioner's application for habeas corpus relief by MICHAEL DONAHUE filed by AMELIA G HELMICK. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Removal Order of Immigration Judge). Motion(s) referred to STEPHEN HYLES.(HELMICK, AMELIA)
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER for Respondent to File Responsive Pleading re: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES on 10-29-19. (rcg) Modified on 10/29/2019 (esl). MAILED
October 28, 2019 Filing 3 Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to JULIEN HERODE (tlf).
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Hyles issued at the direction of the Court (tlf).
October 25, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS filed by JULIEN HERODE. Filing fee of $5.00, receipt number 42328 (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents, #2 Envelope) (tlf).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HERODE v. DONAHUE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: JULIEN HERODE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: WARDEN MICHAEL DONAHUE
Represented By: AMELIA G HELMICK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (NOTICE)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?