BRUNSON v AMERICAN INTERNATIONAL MOVERS INC
Plaintiff: TONY BRUNSON
Defendant: AMERICAN INTERNATIONAL MOVERS INC
Case Number: 4:2019cv00189
Filed: November 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: CLAY D LAND
Nature of Suit: State Reapportionment
Cause of Action: 49 U.S.C. ยง 81
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 27, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE Plaintiff's Initial Disclosures by TONY BRUNSON (BUCHANAN, JERRY)
December 27, 2019 Filing 8 SCHEDULING/DISCOVERY ORDER: Discovery to be complete by 6/10/2020. Dispositive motions due by 7/27/2020. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D. LAND on 12/27/2019 (tlf).
December 27, 2019 Notice of Deficiency; Related document: #9 Notice (Other) filed by TONY BRUNSON; Pursuant to Local Rule 5.1 Discovery is not filed in the Middle District of Georgia. Please do not file discovery matters in the future (tlf).
December 19, 2019 Filing 7 REPLY to Response filed by AMERICAN INTERNATIONAL MOVERS INC re #3 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint re #1 Notice of Removal, : (CASH, BLAIR)
December 6, 2019 Filing 6 RESPONSE filed by TONY BRUNSON re #3 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint re #1 Notice of Removal, : (BUCHANAN, JERRY)
November 15, 2019 Filing 5 RULES 16/26 ORDER:Proposed Scheduling/Discovery order due by 12/27/2019. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND on 11/15/2019. (esl)
November 15, 2019 Filing 4 ***IGNORE - WRONG EVENT USED*** SCHEDULING/DISCOVERY ORDER:Proposed Pretrial Order due by 12/27/2019. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND on 11/15/2019. (esl) Modified on 11/15/2019 (esl).
November 15, 2019 Notice of Deficiency (related document: #4 Scheduling/Discovery Order); Wrong event used. The Rules 16/26 Order was erroneously filed using the event Scheduling/Discovery Order. To clear up any confusion, the Order will be re-filed using the correct event. Apologies for the administrative error. (esl)
November 13, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint re #1 Notice of Removal, : by AMERICAN INTERNATIONAL MOVERS INC filed by BLAIR JOSEPH CASH.(CASH, BLAIR)
November 6, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by American International Movers Inc a subsidiary of Hi-Boy Group Inc (CASH, BLAIR)
November 6, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL against American International Movers Inc a subsidiary of Hi-Boy Group Inc Fee paid: Receipt # AGAMDC-3308020, $400 filed by American International Movers Inc a subsidiary of Hi-Boy Group Inc (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Notice of Removal - COMPLAINT, #2 Exhibit B to Notice of Removal, #3 Memorandum in Support of Notice of Removal)(CASH, BLAIR) Modified on 11/8/2019 (esl).
November 6, 2019 Notice of Deficiency (related documents: #1 Notice of Removal and #2 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by AMERICAN INTERNATIONAL MOVERS INC. DO NOT RE-FILE as the case manager has corrected the errors. Parties were added using punctuation AND/OR title capitalization. The case opening guide states ***REMINDER*** all parties must be added using ALL CAPS (ie LISA SMITH or DELTA AIRLINES). Do not use ANY punctuation when adding new parties. For instructions on adding parties, please refer to the Style Guide located on the website for the Middle District of Georgia. Additionally, defendant erroneously added the parent company in the wrong text box. NO NEED TO REFILE. (esl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BRUNSON v AMERICAN INTERNATIONAL MOVERS INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMERICAN INTERNATIONAL MOVERS INC
Represented By: BLAIR JOSEPH CASH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TONY BRUNSON
Represented By: TRISHA HARGROVE
Represented By: JERRY A BUCHANAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?