SALAS v. POLAK et al
Plaintiff: ZACHARY KALEOKALANI SALAS
Defendant: AARON POLAK, LYFT INC and UBER USA LLC
Case Number: 4:2019cv00198
Filed: November 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: CLAY D LAND
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 16, 2020 Filing 21 This is a text only entry; no document issued. ORDER granting #18 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. This consent motion is granted. Defendant has until February 10, 2020 to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's complaint. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND on 1/16/2020 (mdb)
January 15, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE Plaintiff's Consent to Amended Motion of Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by LYFT INC re #16 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint (SCHNELL, GRANT)
January 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #16 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint. Answer deadline set for 2/27/2020. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND on 1/15/2020 (tlp)
January 15, 2020 Filing 18 CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by UBER USA LLC filed by COLIN KAMRATH KELLY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Email confirming consent of pro se Plaintiff)(KELLY, COLIN)
January 13, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE Lyft, Inc.'s Certificate of Service of Amended Motion for Extenstion of Time to Respond to Complaint by LYFT INC re #16 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint (SCHNELL, GRANT)
January 10, 2020 Notice of Deficiency; Related document: #16 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by LYFT, INC.; Plaintiff is not a registered CM/ECF user and thus must be served by conventional means outside of CM/ECF, as he does not get served via CM/ECF. A certificate of Service for document indicating plaintiff was served outside of CM/ECF not attached. Additionally, the proposed Order contains a signature block for a judge not assigned to this case or even within the district. To remedy the service issue, please serve plaintiff by conventional means and then file a certificate of service using the event Civil Events, Initial Pleadings and Service, Service of Process, Certificate of Service. To remedy the proposed Order issue, please send a proposed Order in Word processing format to columbus.ecf@gamd.uscourts.gov (tlf).
January 10, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by LYFT INC filed by CYNTHIA G BURNSIDE. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(BURNSIDE, CYNTHIA)
January 10, 2020 Filing 15 Replaced by D.E. #16 . MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by LYFT INC filed by CYNTHIA G BURNSIDE.(BURNSIDE, CYNTHIA) Modified on 1/10/2020 (tlf).
January 9, 2020 Plaintiffs Requests for CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to is DECLINED - Time for responsive pleading or dispositive motion has not lapsed. (tlp)
January 8, 2020 Filing 14 Application to Clerk for Entry of Default against LYFT INC (tlp)
January 8, 2020 Filing 13 Application to Clerk for Entry of Default against UBER USA LLC (tlp)
January 8, 2020 Filing 12 Application to Clerk for Entry of Default against AARON POLAK (tlp)
January 8, 2020 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to AARON POLAK (tlp)
January 8, 2020 Filing 10 USM 285 Process Receipt and Return EXECUTED for AARON POLAK (tlp)
December 17, 2019 Filing 9 USM 285 Process Receipt and Return MAILED for LYFT INC, AARON POLAK, UBER USA LLC (tlp)
December 9, 2019 Filing 8 USM 285 Process Receipt and Return ISSUED for LYFT INC, AARON POLAK, UBER USA LLC (tlp)
December 4, 2019 Filing 7 This is a text only entry; no document issued. ORDER denying #6 Motion for Leave to File Under Seal. Plaintiff misunderstands the public nature of federal courts. Except for extraordinary circumstances, filings in federal court are accessible to the public. Speculation that future filings may include proprietary confidential information does not authorize the sealing of an entire complaint or civil action. As the Court noted in its previous order, there is nothing in Plaintiff's complaint that is proprietary or confidential such that the Complaint should be filed under seal. If during the pendency of this action, Plaintiff believes certain matters are protected due to proprietary confidential reasons, Plaintiff may file a motion related to the specific document informing the Court why the particular document should be filed with restricted access. Plaintiff's motion, however as it currently stands, is denied--again. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND on December 4, 2019 (CDL)
December 3, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to File Complaint under Seal - filed by ZACHARY KALEOKALANI SALAS.(tlp) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/3/2019: #1 Proposed Order) (tlp).
December 3, 2019 US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES no longer assigned to case. (tlp)
December 3, 2019 Filing 5 This is a text only entry; no document issued. ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and directing service by USMS. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES on 12-3-19. (jdl)
December 3, 2019 Filing 4 This is a text only entry; no document issued. ORDER denying #3 Motion to Seal Document. Out of an abundance of caution and at Plaintiff's request, the Clerk's Office temporarily administratively sealed this file so that no documents would be accessible on the public docket. Having reviewed Plaintiff's complaint and request to seal, the Court finds that neither this action nor Plaintiff's complaint should be sealed. The Clerk is directed to unseal this case such that it shall be treated like any other action with unrestricted public access. If Plaintiff or the other parties determine that certain specific proprietary information should be restricted, they may file a motion to have access to those specific documents restricted. The Magistrate Judge shall decide Plaintiff's pending motion to proceed in forma pauperis, after which the case shall be handled by the undersigned. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND on December 3, 2019 (CDL)
December 3, 2019 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES for review of pending motions.. Motion(s) referred to STEPHEN HYLES.(tlp)
December 3, 2019 CASE SEALED (tlp)
November 26, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Seal Document(s) #1 Complaint - filed by ZACHARY KALEOKALANI SALAS.(tlp)
November 26, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis - filed by ZACHARY KALEOKALANI SALAS.(tlp) Modified on 12/3/2019 (tlp).
November 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against LYFT INC, AARON POLAK, UBER USA LLC - filed by ZACHARY KALEOKALANI SALAS. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(tlp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SALAS v. POLAK et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AARON POLAK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LYFT INC
Represented By: CYNTHIA G BURNSIDE
Represented By: GRANT SCHNELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UBER USA LLC
Represented By: COLIN KAMRATH KELLY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ZACHARY KALEOKALANI SALAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?