CARDEN v. EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES LLC et al
Plaintiff: KENITA CARDEN
Defendant: NELNET BUSINESS SOLUTIONS INC, EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES LLC and NELNET SERVICING LLC
Case Number: 4:2019cv00202
Filed: December 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: CLAY D LAND
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 22, 2020 REMARK: Defendant NELNET BUSINESS SOLUTIONS INC's name updated to reflect the correct name: NELNET SERVICING LLC. (ggs)
January 22, 2020 Filing 15 AMENDED #1 Complaint, against NELNET SERVICING LLC by KENITA CARDEN (GOMEZ, OCTAVIO) Modified on 1/22/2020 to edit name of defendant. (ggs).
January 22, 2020 Filing 14 This is a text only entry; no document issued. ORDER granting #13 Unopposed Motion to Amend/Correct. Plaintiff shall be permitted to amend her Complaint to name the correct Defendant. Plaintiff shall file her amended complaint on CM/ECF by January 29, 2020. The motion to dismiss for failure to name the proper legal entity #12 is moot. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND on 01/22/2020 (CCL)
January 21, 2020 Filing 13 UNOPPOSED MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint, by KENITA CARDEN filed by OCTAVIO GOMEZ. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit First Amended Complaint)(GOMEZ, OCTAVIO)
January 13, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 17(a)(3) for failure to identify the proper legal entity by NELNET BUSINESS SOLUTIONS INC filed by Daniel J. Huff.(Huff, Daniel)
January 13, 2020 Filing 11 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by NELNET BUSINESS SOLUTIONS INC (Huff, Daniel)
January 13, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint by NELNET BUSINESS SOLUTIONS INC.(Huff, Daniel)
December 30, 2019 Filing 9 RULES 16/26 ORDER: Proposed Scheduling/Discovery order due by 2/10/2020. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D. LAND on 12/30/2019 (tlf).
December 27, 2019 REMARK: Insofar as Local Rule 6.1 provides that counsel may stipulate for "...extensions of time within which to answer the complaint...by written, filed stipulations of counsel, not to exceed more than thirty (30) from the original answer deadline..." and insofar as the requested extension does not exceed 30 days, #8 motion is being construed as such a stipulation, and the motion is being administratively terminated without ruling by the Court (tlf).
December 27, 2019 Filing 8 JOINT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by NELNET BUSINESS SOLUTIONS INC filed by Daniel J. Huff. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Re Extension to Answer Complaint)(Huff, Daniel)
December 26, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES LLC identifying Corporate Parent EQUIFAX INC for EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES LLC. (PERLING, LEWIS)
December 26, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES LLC.(PERLING, LEWIS)Attorney LEWIS P PERLING added to party EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES LLC(pty:dft)
December 4, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by KENITA CARDEN as to NELNET BUSINESS SOLUTIONS INC. (GOMEZ, OCTAVIO)
December 4, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by KENITA CARDEN as to EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES LLC. (GOMEZ, OCTAVIO)
December 2, 2019 Filing 3 Summons issued as to NELNET BUSINESS SOLUTIONS, INC. (tlf).
December 2, 2019 Filing 2 Summons issued as to EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC (tlf).
December 2, 2019 Notice of Deficiency, Related document: #1 Complaint, filed by KENITA CARDEN; Parties were added using punctuation AND/OR title capitalization. The case opening guide states ***REMINDER*** all parties must be added using ALL CAPS (ie LISA SMITH or DELTA AIRLINES). Do not use ANY punctuation when adding new parties. For instructions on adding parties, please refer to the Style Guide located on the website for the Middle District of Georgia. No need to re-file (tlf).
December 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES LLC, NELNET BUSINESS SOLUTIONS, INC. Fee paid: Receipt # AGAMDC-3328773, $400 filed by KENITA CARDEN (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(GOMEZ, OCTAVIO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CARDEN v. EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NELNET BUSINESS SOLUTIONS INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES LLC
Represented By: LEWIS P PERLING
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NELNET SERVICING LLC
Represented By: Daniel J. Huff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KENITA CARDEN
Represented By: OCTAVIO GOMEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?