SOUTHEAST FOREST PRODUCTS MANUFACTURING INC v. DICKERT ENTERPRISES INC
Plaintiff: SOUTHEAST FOREST PRODUCTS MANUFACTURING INC
Defendant: DICKERT ENTERPRISES INC and DICKERT ENTERPRISES INC doing business as BEN JONES MACHINERY
Case Number: 4:2019cv00221
Filed: December 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: CLAY D LAND
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 13, 2020 Filing 13 CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by DICKERT ENTERPRISES INC filed by THOMAS F GRISTINA.(GRISTINA, THOMAS)
January 14, 2020 Filing 12 STIPULATION for Extension of Time re #1 Complaint by DICKERT ENTERPRISES INC (GIBSON, AUSTIN)
January 14, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by AUSTIN S GIBSON on behalf of DICKERT ENTERPRISES INC Attorney AUSTIN S GIBSON added to party DICKERT ENTERPRISES INC(pty:dft) (GIBSON, AUSTIN)
January 14, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by THOMAS F GRISTINA on behalf of DICKERT ENTERPRISES INC Attorney THOMAS F GRISTINA added to party DICKERT ENTERPRISES INC(pty:dft) (GRISTINA, THOMAS)
January 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order granting Petition for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Petition Attached); Attorney Admission Fee Met by JAMES B EUBANK (nop)
January 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order granting Petition for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Petition Attached); Attorney Admission Fee Met by C LANCE GOULD (nop)
January 8, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by SOUTHEAST FOREST PRODUCTS MANUFACTURING INC as to DICKERT ENTERPRISES INC. (BASKAM, ALYSSA)
January 7, 2020 Filing 6 PETITION TO THE CLERK FOR ADMISSION TO PLEAD AND PRACTICE PRO HAC VICE by SOUTHEAST FOREST PRODUCTS MANUFACTURING INC Attorney Admission Fee (Pro Hac Vice) paid by Receipt # BGAMDC-3355879, $100. LOCAL COUNSEL Name and Georgia Bar #: Alyssa B. Baskam. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(EUBANK, JAMES)
January 7, 2020 Filing 5 PETITION TO THE CLERK FOR ADMISSION TO PLEAD AND PRACTICE PRO HAC VICE by SOUTHEAST FOREST PRODUCTS MANUFACTURING INC Attorney Admission Fee (Pro Hac Vice) paid by Receipt # AGAMDC-3355718, $100. LOCAL COUNSEL Name and Georgia Bar #: Alyssa B. Baskam - 776157. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing Certificate of Good Standing)(GOULD, C)
December 30, 2019 Filing 4 Jurisdictional Statement by SOUTHEAST FOREST PRODUCTS MANUFACTURING INC (BASKAM, ALYSSA)
December 27, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by SOUTHEAST FOREST PRODUCTS MANUFACTURING INC (BASKAM, ALYSSA)
December 27, 2019 REMARK: Per counsel, Alyssa Baskam, contact information is accurate as listed on the docket as they maintain multiple offices. (deb)
December 27, 2019 Notice of Deficiency; Related document(s): #1 Complaint filed by SOUTHEAST FOREST PRODUCTS MANUFACTURING, INC.; Notice to Counsel - Alyssa Baskam Your contact information in CM/ECF is not current. Please update your contact information via PACER. Visit PACER.gov; Click Manage My Account in the upper right hand corner of the PACER home page; On the Manage My Account screen, participant should see 4 tabs to click on (Settings, Maintenance, Payments, Usage); Click Maintenance; Update Address Information (tlf).
December 27, 2019 Filing 2 Summons issued as to DICKERT ENTERPRISES, INC. (tlf).
December 27, 2019 Notice of Deficiency; Related document: #1 Complaint filed by SOUTHEAST FOREST PRODUCTS MANUFACTURING, INC.; Pursuant to Local Rule 87.1, all nongovernmental corporate parties must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement. Please file the required corporate disclosures immediately. Additionally, pursuant to Local Rule 87.2 a separate Jurisdictional Statement must be filed in cases involving diversity (tlf).
December 27, 2019 NOTICE TO COUNSEL C. LANCE GOULD and JAMES B. EUBANK - Counsel is notified that they do not show in the court records that they meet the required attorney admissions policies of this court. If within 14 days of this notice all requirements, including the payment of Pro Hac Vice or admissions fees, have not been met, a show cause hearing may be scheduled (tlf).
December 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Fee paid: Receipt # AGAMDC-3347992, $400 filed by All Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Exhibit Sales Agreement)(BASKAM, ALYSSA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SOUTHEAST FOREST PRODUCTS MANUFACTURING INC v. DICKERT ENTERPRISES INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SOUTHEAST FOREST PRODUCTS MANUFACTURING INC
Represented By: ALYSSA BASKAM
Represented By: C LANCE GOULD
Represented By: JAMES B EUBANK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DICKERT ENTERPRISES INC
Represented By: THOMAS F GRISTINA
Represented By: WILLIAM L TUCKER
Represented By: AUSTIN S GIBSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DICKERT ENTERPRISES INC doing business as BEN JONES MACHINERY
Represented By: THOMAS F GRISTINA
Represented By: WILLIAM L TUCKER
Represented By: AUSTIN S GIBSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?