GUTIERREZ v. WASHBURN
Petitioner: SAMUEL AARON PERNIA GUTIERREZ
Respondent: Warden RUSSELL WASHBURN
Case Number: 4:2020cv00122
Filed: June 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: STEPHEN HYLES
Referring Judge: CLAY D LAND
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2020 Filing 8 RESPONSE to #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by RUSSELL WASHBURN. Related document: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by SAMUEL AARON PERNIA GUTIERREZ. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Deportation Officer Selwyn Bunbury, #2 Exhibit A - Form I-213, Record of Deportable/Inadmissible Alien dated 6-2-16, #3 Exhibit B - Notice to Appear, #4 Exhibit C - Conviction Documents, #5 Exhibit D - Order of Immigration Judge dated 6-16-16, #6 Exhibit E - Order of Immigration Judge dated 2-12-18, #7 Exhibit F - Form I-213, Record of Deportable/Inadmissible Alien dated 5-4-19, #8 Exhibit G - BIA Decision dated 9-17-19, #9 Exhibit H - Form I-229(a) - Warning for Failure to Depart, #10 Exhibit I - Decision to Continue Detention Letter dated 12-18-19, #11 Exhibit J - Decision to Continue Detention Letter dated 4-6-20, #12 Exhibit K - Travel Document)(HELMICK, AMELIA)
June 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER setting briefing schedule. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES on 6-29-20. (jdl)
June 29, 2020 Filing 6 RETURN RESPONSE re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by RUSSELL WASHBURN (HELMICK, AMELIA)
June 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER for Respondent to File Responsive Pleading re: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by SAMUEL AARON PERNIA GUTIERREZ. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES on 6-24-20. (jdl)
June 23, 2020 Filing 4 Filing fee Paid: Habeas $5 - Manual Receipt 42446 (tlp) (tlp).
June 10, 2020 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by SAMUEL AARON PERNIA GUTIERREZ ); You must either pay the filing fee or submit a properly completed Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis within 21 days from the date of this notice. Failure to comply with this notice may result in dismissal by the court. An Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit are enclosed. (tlp)
June 10, 2020 Filing 3 Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to SAMUEL AARON PERNIA GUTIERREZ (tlp)
June 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge issued at the direction of the Court. (tlp)
June 10, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS - filed by SAMUEL AARON PERNIA GUTIERREZ. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Envelope)(tlp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GUTIERREZ v. WASHBURN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden RUSSELL WASHBURN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: SAMUEL AARON PERNIA GUTIERREZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?