GREENE v. QUICKEN LOANS
Plaintiff: SHEREEN R GREENE
Defendant: QUICKEN LOANS
Case Number: 4:2020cv00135
Filed: June 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: CLAY D LAND
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 17, 2020 Filing 10 This is a text only entry; no document issued. ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Plaintiff shall file any response to the motion to dismiss and the notice of removal by August 31, 2020. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND on 07/17/2020 (CCL)
July 16, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE OF CLERK'S DECISION RE: E-Filing for SHEREEN R. GREENE. Request to E-File is GRANTED. You must register to E-File via PACER.gov (tlf).
July 16, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File RESPONSE as to #5 MOTION to Dismiss the claims in this action in their entirety with prejudice filed by SHEREEN R. GREENE (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (tlf).
July 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion to Stay. Discovery and the deadlines set in the Court's 16/26 Order are stayed pending the Court's ruling on Defendant's motion to dismiss. (CCL)
July 13, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Stay Discovery and Pretrial Deadlines by QUICKEN LOANS filed by JANINE CONE METCALF. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of its Motion to Stay Discovery and Pretrial Deadlines, #2 Exhibit 1 - 7/6/2020 Letter from Metcalf to Greene re filing consent motion to stay discovery)(METCALF, JANINE)
July 6, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss the claims in this action in their entirety with prejudice by QUICKEN LOANS filed by JANINE CONE METCALF. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of its Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit 1 - 6.5.2020 Affidavit of Service, #3 Exhibit 2 - 11.26.2019 Opinion Affirming District Court's Dismissal, #4 Exhibit 3 - Note, #5 Exhibit 4 - Security Deed, #6 Exhibit 5 - Deed of Gift)(METCALF, JANINE)
June 29, 2020 Filing 4 RULES 16/26 ORDER: Proposed Scheduling/Discovery order due by 8/10/2020. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D. LAND on 6/29/2020 (tlf).
June 26, 2020 Filing 3 Jurisdictional Statement by QUICKEN LOANS (METCALF, JANINE)
June 26, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by QUICKEN LOANS (METCALF, JANINE)
June 26, 2020 Notice of Deficiency; Related document: #1 Notice of Removal,, filed by QUICKEN LOANS; Notice to Counsel: JANINE METCALF. Some of your contact information in CM/ECF does not match the information upon the pleading. Please update your contact information via PACER (tlf).
June 26, 2020 Please disregard. Disclosures were filed Notice of Deficiency; Related document: #1 Notice of Removal,, filed by QUICKEN LOANS ); Pursuant to Local Rule 87.1, all nongovernmental corporate parties must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement. Please file the required corporate disclosures immediately. Local Rule 87.3 provides: "TIME FOR FILING. A party shall file the statements with its initial pleading filed in this court and shall supplement the statements within a reasonable time of any change in the information." (tlf). Modified on 6/26/2020 (tlf).
June 26, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL against SHEREEN R GREENE Fee paid: Receipt # AGAMDC-3497832, $400 filed by QUICKEN LOANS (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Filings from Muscogee County Superior Court, #2 Exhibit B - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal in Muscogee County Superior Court, #3 Exhibit C - Declaration of Defendant Quicken Loans' Representative, #4 Exhibit D - Second Amended Complaint filed 11-26-2018 (ECF 17), #5 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(METCALF, JANINE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GREENE v. QUICKEN LOANS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHEREEN R GREENE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: QUICKEN LOANS
Represented By: JANINE CONE METCALF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?