LODGE v. BARR
Petitioner: ROBERT LODGE
Respondent: WILLIAM BARR
Case Number: 4:2020cv00165
Filed: July 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: STEPHEN HYLES
Referring Judge: CLAY D LAND
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2020 Filing 9 Duplicate entry please ignore. ORDER TO CONSOLIDATE CASE Lead Case # 4:20-cv-140. Member Case # 4:20-cv-165. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES on 8/12/2020 (tlf). Modified on 8/12/2020 (tlf).
August 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER TO CONSOLIDATE CASE. Lead Case # 4:20-cv-140. Member Case # 4:20-cv-165. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES on 8-12-20. (jdl)
July 21, 2020 Notice of Deficiency; Related document: 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by ROBERT LODGE; You must either pay the filing fee or submit a properly completed Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis within 21 days from the date of this notice. Failure to comply with this notice may result in dismissal by the court. An Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit are enclosed (tlf).
July 21, 2020 Filing 7 Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to ROBERT LODGE (tlf).
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Hyles issued at the direction of the Court. (tlf).
July 21, 2020 Filing 5 Case transferred in District Transfer from District of Georgia Northern; Case Number 2:20-cv-00164. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. **The Notice of Electronic Filing serves as certification for these transferred documents.**
July 21, 2020 Case transferred to District of Middle District of Georgia, Columbus Division. Original file, Copy of transfer order and docket sheet sent. (dgr) [Transferred from gand on 7/21/2020.]
July 21, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Robert Lodge re #4 Order. (dgr) [Transferred from gand on 7/21/2020.]
July 21, 2020 Civil Case Terminated. Magistrate Judge J. Clay Fuller terminated from case. (dgr) [Transferred from gand on 7/21/2020.]
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: Petitioner is presently incarcerated at the Stewart Detention Center in Lumpkin, Georgia. On July 1, 2020, the United States District Court for the Eastern District of New York transferred Petitioner's habeas corpus petition to this Court based on the mistaken conclusion that Lumpkin, Georgia is located in the Northern District of Georgia. However, while the county ofLumpkin is located in the Northern District of Georgia, the city ofLumpkin, located in Stewart County, is in the Columbus Division of the Middle District of Georgia, which is where venue for this action properly lies. Therefore, the Clerk is directed to TRANSFER this action to the United States District Court for the Middle District of Georgia, Columbus Division and to close the pending case in this Court. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 7/20/2020. (dgr) [Transferred from gand on 7/21/2020.]
July 15, 2020 Submission of 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, to Magistrate Judge J. Clay Fuller. (No Filing Fee or IFP) (aar) [Transferred from gand on 7/21/2020.]
July 15, 2020 Filing 3 Case transferred in from District of New York Eastern; Case Number 1:20-cv-02971. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. [Transferred from gand on 7/21/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LODGE v. BARR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: WILLIAM BARR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: ROBERT LODGE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?