TARAWALLY v. BARR et al
Petitioner: ISSA TARAWALLY
Respondent: CHAD WOLF, Warden RUSSELL WASHBURN, J D THORPE and WILLIAM BARR
Not Classified By Court: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (NOTICE)
Case Number: 4:2020cv00168
Filed: July 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: STEPHEN HYLES
Referring Judge: CLAY D LAND
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2020 Filing 10 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #7 MOTION to Dismiss Petitoiner's application for habeas corpus relief filed by J D THORPE, RUSSELL WASHBURN, CHAD WOLF, WILLIAM BARR. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES on 9-17-20. (jdl)
August 25, 2020 Filing 9 Mail Returned - #8 Order for Response to Motion, sent returned as undeliverable. (tlp)
August 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER for Response to #7 MOTION to Dismiss Petitoiner's application for habeas corpus relief filed by J D THORPE, RUSSELL WASHBURN, CHAD WOLF, WILLIAM BARR. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES on 8-7-20. (jdl)
August 7, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss Petitoiner's application for habeas corpus relief by WILLIAM BARR, J D THORPE, RUSSELL WASHBURN, CHAD WOLF filed by AMELIA G HELMICK. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Order of Supervision). Motion(s) referred to STEPHEN HYLES.(HELMICK, AMELIA)
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER setting briefing schedule. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES on 7-24-20. (jdl)
July 24, 2020 Filing 5 RETURN RESPONSE re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by WILLIAM BARR, J D THORPE, RUSSELL WASHBURN, CHAD WOLF (HELMICK, AMELIA)
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER for Respondent to File Responsive Pleading re: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by ISSA TARAWALLY. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES on 7-21-20. (jdl)
July 21, 2020 Filing 3 Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to ISSA TARAWALLY (tlf).
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Hyles issued at the direction of the Court (tlf).
July 21, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS filed by ISSA TARAWALLY. Filing fee $5.00, receipt number 42505 (Attachments: #1 Immigration Documents, #2 Envelope) (tlf).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TARAWALLY v. BARR et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: CHAD WOLF
Represented By: AMELIA G HELMICK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden RUSSELL WASHBURN
Represented By: AMELIA G HELMICK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: J D THORPE
Represented By: AMELIA G HELMICK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: WILLIAM BARR
Represented By: AMELIA G HELMICK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: ISSA TARAWALLY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (NOTICE)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?