MULLINS v. HUMANA HEALTH PLAN INC, et al.
Plaintiff: REBECCA C MULLINS
Defendant: HUMANA HEALTH PLAN INC and NORTHSIDE HOSPITAL INC FLEXIBLE BENEFITS PLAN
Case Number: 4:2020cv00192
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: CLAY D LAND
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2021 Filing 32 STIPULATION of Dismissal by HUMANA HEALTH PLAN INC as to HUMANA HEALTH PLAN INC, REBECCA C MULLINS, NORTHSIDE HOSPITAL INC FLEXIBLE BENEFITS PLAN (COPPAGE, KENTON)
September 7, 2021 Filing 31 JUDGMENT dismissing case. (esl)
September 7, 2021 Filing 30 This is a text only entry; no document issued. ORDER OF DISMISSAL The parties filed a notice of settlement #29 representing that a stipulation of dismissal would be filed by August 30, 2021. That deadline has expired, and accordingly, the Court dismisses this action based upon the parties' representation that the action has settled. The parties shall bear their own costs unless otherwise modified by their settlement agreement. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND on 09/07/2021. (CCL)
July 14, 2021 Filing 29 NOTICE of Settlement JOINT NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT by REBECCA C MULLINS(PRIDGEN, NANCY)
June 23, 2021 Filing 28 This is a text only entry; no document issued. ORDER granting #27 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Discovery to be complete by 8/12/2021. Dispositive motions due by 9/13/2021. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND on 06/23/2021 (CCL)
June 22, 2021 Filing 27 JOINT MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by REBECCA C MULLINS filed by NANCY B PRIDGEN. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion)(PRIDGEN, NANCY)
April 21, 2021 Filing 26 This is a text only entry; no document issued.AMENDED SCHEDULING/DISCOVERY ORDER granting motion for extension #25 :Discovery to be complete by 6/28/2021.Non-Dispositive motions due by 6/28/2021.Dispositive motions due by 7/28/2021; briefing shall follow the schedule set forth in the local rules, though the clerk may grant extensions as allowed in the local rules.If the Court determines that oral argument is necessary, the Court will schedule a hearing for a date and time that fits in the Court's schedule. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND on 04/21/2021. (CCL)
April 21, 2021 Filing 25 JOINT MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by REBECCA C MULLINS filed by NANCY B PRIDGEN. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(PRIDGEN, NANCY)
February 22, 2021 Filing 24 This is a text only entry; no document issued. ORDER granting #23 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney MEREDITH JACOBOWITZ terminated Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND on 02/22/2021 (CCL)
February 19, 2021 Filing 23 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by NORTHSIDE HOSPITAL INC FLEXIBLE BENEFITS PLAN filed by MEREDITH JACOBOWITZ.(JACOBOWITZ, MEREDITH)
November 30, 2020 Filing 22 SCHEDULING/DISCOVERY ORDER:Discovery to be complete by 4/27/2021. Dispositive motions due by 5/28/2021. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND on 11/30/2020. (tlp)
November 13, 2020 Filing 21 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D. LAND on 11/13/2020 (tlf).
November 12, 2020 Filing 20 JOINT MOTION for Protective Order by HUMANA HEALTH PLAN INC filed by KENTON J. COPPAGE. (Attachments: #1 Stipulated Protective Order)(COPPAGE, KENTON)
November 12, 2020 Filing 19 Replaced by D.E. #20 ; JOINT MOTION for Entry of Stipulated Protective Order by HUMANA HEALTH PLAN INC filed by KENTON J. COPPAGE. (Attachments: #1 Stipulated Protective Order)(COPPAGE, KENTON) Modified on 11/12/2020 (tlf).
November 12, 2020 Notice of Deficiency; Document must be re-filed; Related document: #19 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief filed by HUMANA HEALTH PLAN INC ; Document must be re-filed using correct event which is Civil Events. Motions and Related Filings, Motions, Protective Order (tlf).
October 28, 2020 Filing 18 RULES 16/26 ORDER:Proposed Scheduling/Discovery order due by 12/9/2020. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND on 10/28/2020. (tlp)
October 27, 2020 Filing 17 Corporate Disclosure Statement by NORTHSIDE HOSPITAL INC FLEXIBLE BENEFITS PLAN (Brockman, William)
October 27, 2020 Filing 16 ANSWER to Complaint by NORTHSIDE HOSPITAL INC FLEXIBLE BENEFITS PLAN.(Brockman, William)
October 27, 2020 Filing 15 Corporate Disclosure Statement by HUMANA HEALTH PLAN INC identifying Corporate Parent HUMANA INC for HUMANA HEALTH PLAN INC. (COPPAGE, KENTON)
October 27, 2020 Filing 14 PLEASE DISREGARD; DOCUMENT REFILED - SEE ECF No. 14. Corporate Disclosure Statement by HUMANA HEALTH PLAN INC (COPPAGE, KENTON) Modified on 10/27/2020 (tlp) - to annotate document refiled
October 27, 2020 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint by HUMANA HEALTH PLAN INC.(COPPAGE, KENTON)
October 27, 2020 Notice of Deficiency as to #14 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by HUMANA HEALTH PLAN INC. Document must be re-filed to add corporate parents, subsidiary corporations and/or any publicly held corporation that owns 10% or more of its stock to the case.(tlp)
October 27, 2020 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #13 Answer to Complaint filed by HUMANA HEALTH PLAN INC ); Notice to Counsel - KENTON J COPPAGE - Your contact information in CM/ECF does not match the information on the pleadings (ECF No. 13). Please promptly update your contact information via PACER.(tlp)
October 27, 2020 Notice of Deficiency - Notice to Counsel - MEREDITH JACOBOWITZ. There appears to be a typographical error in the database as to the spelling of your first name; it appears MEREDIT JACOBOWITZ. Please promptly update/correct the spelling of your name via PACER.(tlp)
September 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER re #11 Petition to the Clerk for Admission to Plead and Practice Pro Hac Vice, filed by NORTHSIDE HOSPITAL INC FLEXIBLE BENEFITS PLAN. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(ans)
September 16, 2020 Filing 11 PETITION TO THE CLERK FOR ADMISSION TO PLEAD AND PRACTICE PRO HAC VICE by NORTHSIDE HOSPITAL INC FLEXIBLE BENEFITS PLAN Attorney Admission Fee (Pro Hac Vice) paid by Receipt # AGAMDC-3569084, $100. LOCAL COUNSEL Name and Georgia Bar #: W. Bard Brockman, Bar No. 084230. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing Certificate of Good Standing)(JACOBOWITZ, MEREDIT)
September 8, 2020 Filing 10 This is a text only entry; no document issued. ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Humana Health Plan, Inc. shall respond to the Complaint by October 27, 2020. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND on 09/08/2020 (CCL)
September 4, 2020 Filing 9 CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by HUMANA HEALTH PLAN INC filed by KENTON J. COPPAGE.(COPPAGE, KENTON)
September 4, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by REBECCA C MULLINS as to HUMANA HEALTH PLAN INC. (PRIDGEN, NANCY)
September 4, 2020 Filing 7 This is a text only entry; no document issued. ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant shall respond to the Complaint by October 27, 2020. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND on 09/04/2020 (CCL)
September 3, 2020 Filing 6 CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Complaint. by NORTHSIDE HOSPITAL INC FLEXIBLE BENEFITS PLAN filed by William Bard Brockman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - PROPOSED ORDER)(Brockman, William)
August 30, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by REBECCA C MULLINS as to NORTHSIDE HOSPITAL INC FLEXIBLE BENEFITS PLAN. (PRIDGEN, NANCY)
August 24, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE Notice of Filing Exhibits to Complaint by REBECCA C MULLINS re #1 Complaint, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Northside Hospital Inc. Flexible Benefits Plan Document, #2 Exhibit 2 - Summary Plan Description (SPD), #3 Exhibit 3 - Northside Correspondence June 22, 2020, #4 Exhibit 4 - Notification of Certification of Services April 12, 2019, #5 Exhibit 5 - Notification of Certification of Services April 19, 2019, #6 Exhibit 6 - Notification of Certification of Services April 24, 2019, #7 Exhibit 7 - Humana EOB May 12-26, 2019, #8 Exhibit 8 - Pridgen Appeal to Humana October 27, 2019, #9 Exhibit 9 - Humana Appeal Denial December 30, 2019, #10 Exhibit 10 - Humana Error letter June 3, 2020)(PRIDGEN, NANCY)
August 24, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE Notice of Filing Exhibits to Complaint by REBECCA C MULLINS re #1 Complaint, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10)(PRIDGEN, NANCY)
August 24, 2020 Notice of Deficiency as tp #3 Notice of Filing Exhibits. Exhibits attached to documents must be REFILED and must include a description of exhibits beyond Exhibit "x"; During the filing process a user message was displayed as follows: "A description must be entered for each attachment. For exhibits, a generic identifier such as Exhibit A or Exhibit 1 is not acceptable." Please adhere to user messages in the future and label attachments with more specificity. (tlp)
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Humana Health Plan, Inc., Northside Hospital, Inc. Flexible Benefits Plan. (Attachments: #1 Summons for Northside Hospital)(tlp)
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Humana Health Plan, Inc., Northside Hospital, Inc. Flexible Benefits Plan Fee paid: Receipt # AGAMDC-3542117, $400 filed by Rebecca C. Mullins (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Humana Health Plan, Inc., #3 Summons Northside Hospital, Inc. Flexible Benefits Plan)(PRIDGEN, NANCY)
August 18, 2020 Notice of Deficiency; No need to re-file; Related document: #1 Complaint, filed by Rebecca C. Mullins ); Parties were added using title capitalization and punctuation. The case opening guide provides as follows: "***REMINDER*** all parties must be added using ALL CAPS. (i.e. LISA SMITH or DELTA AIRLINES). Do not use ANY punctuation when adding new parties. For instructions as to how to add parties, please refer to the Middle District of Georgia's Style Guide... NOTE: If the party in which you are searching is currently in the database in lowercase letters, select the party currently in the system." Changes will be made by case administrator.(tlp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MULLINS v. HUMANA HEALTH PLAN INC, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: REBECCA C MULLINS
Represented By: LESLIE MADDOX BASSETT
Represented By: NANCY B PRIDGEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HUMANA HEALTH PLAN INC
Represented By: KENTON J. COPPAGE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NORTHSIDE HOSPITAL INC FLEXIBLE BENEFITS PLAN
Represented By: William Bard Brockman
Represented By: MEREDIT JACOBOWITZ
Represented By: MEREDITH JACOBOWITZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?