LAUFER v. KRISHNA LLC
Plaintiff: DEBORAH LAUFER
Defendant: KRISHNA LLC
Case Number: 4:2020cv00194
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: CLAY D LAND
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12182
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2020 Filing 7 RESPONSE/AFFIDAVIT to Court Order filed by DEBORAH LAUFER re 6 Order, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(GILLESPIE, TRISTAN) Modified on 9/23/2020 (esl).
September 22, 2020 Filing 6 This is a text only entry; no document issued.ORDER Plaintiff is directed to submit an affidavit in support of her claim for costs and fees. The affidavit is due by October 5, 2020. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND on 09/22/2020. (CCL)
September 21, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Default Judgment as to KRISHNA LLC. by DEBORAH LAUFER filed by TRISTAN WADE GILLESPIE. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(GILLESPIE, TRISTAN)
September 18, 2020 CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to KRISHNA LLC - Plaintiff shall file a motion for default judgment within 21 days. The motion for default judgment shall state whether a hearing is necessary to determine damages, and if a hearing is not necessary, the motion shall include all evidence supporting the damages sought in the motion and a proposed order granting the motion. Failure to comply with this notice may result in this action being dismissed for failure to prosecute. (esl)
September 16, 2020 Filing 4 Application to Clerk for Entry of Default against KRISHNA LLC (GILLESPIE, TRISTAN)
August 28, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by DEBORAH LAUFER as to KRISHNA LLC. (GILLESPIE, TRISTAN)
August 20, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to KRISHNA LLC. (esl)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against KRISHNA LLC Fee paid: Receipt # AGAMDC-3543359, $400 filed by DEBORAH LAUFER (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(GILLESPIE, TRISTAN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LAUFER v. KRISHNA LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DEBORAH LAUFER
Represented By: TRISTAN WADE GILLESPIE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KRISHNA LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?