AYUSHBAATAR v. BARR et al
Petitioner: BATBAGANA AYUSHBAATAR
Respondent: WILLIAM BARR, Warden RUSSELL WASHBURN, RONALD D VITIELLO and KEVIN K MACALEENAN
Not Classified By Court: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (NOTICE)
Case Number: 4:2020cv00261
Filed: October 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: STEPHEN HYLES
Referring Judge: CLAY D LAND
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 11, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER notifying Petitioner of #4 MOTION to Dismiss. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES on 11-9-20. (rcg)
November 6, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss Petitioner's application for a writ of habeas corpus by WILLIAM BARR, KEVIN K MACALEENAN, RONALD D VITIELLO, RUSSELL WASHBURN filed by AMELIA G HELMICK. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - IJ Removal Order, #2 Exhibit B - BIA Order, #3 Exhibit C - Travel Document). Motion(s) referred to STEPHEN HYLES.(HELMICK, AMELIA)
November 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER for Respondents to File Responsive Pleading re: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES on 11-4-20. (rcg)
November 3, 2020 Habeas filing fee of $5.00 paid, receipt number 42572 (tlf).
October 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Hyles issued at the direction of the Court (tlf).
October 23, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS filed by BATBAGANA AYUSHBAATAR (Attachments: #1 Immigration Documents, #2 Envelope)(tlf).
October 23, 2020 Notice of Deficiency; Related document: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by BATBAGANA AYUSHBAATAR; You must either pay the filing fee or submit a properly completed Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis within 21 days from the date of this notice. Failure to comply with this notice may result in dismissal by the court. An Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit are enclosed (tlf).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AYUSHBAATAR v. BARR et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: WILLIAM BARR
Represented By: AMELIA G HELMICK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden RUSSELL WASHBURN
Represented By: AMELIA G HELMICK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: RONALD D VITIELLO
Represented By: AMELIA G HELMICK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: KEVIN K MACALEENAN
Represented By: AMELIA G HELMICK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: BATBAGANA AYUSHBAATAR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (NOTICE)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?