LEGRA-ROMERO v. BARR et al
Petitioner: ALBERTO LEGRA-ROMERO
Respondent: RONALD D VITIELLO, Warden MICHAEL J DONAHUE, ATTORNEY GENERAL WILLIAM BARR, KEVIN K MACALEENAN and UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (NOTICE)
Case Number: 4:2020cv00262
Filed: October 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: STEPHEN HYLES
Referring Judge: CLAY D LAND
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 2, 2020 Filing 8 RESPONSE in Opposition re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Deportation Officer Carroll Campbell, #2 Exhibit A - Form I-213, #3 Exhibit B - Notice to Appear, #4 Exhibit C - Parole Denial, dated 5-15-2019, #5 Exhibit E - Removal Order, dated 1-15-2020, #6 Exhibit F - Decision to Continue Detention Letter, dated 5-7-2020, #7 Exhibit G - Notice to Review Custody Status, dated 8-13-2020, #8 Exhibit 2 - Declaration of Detention and Deportation Officer Ruben Leyva)(SNELL, BERNARD)
December 2, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by BERNARD SNELL on behalf of WILLIAM BARR, MICHAEL J DONAHUE, KEVIN K MACALEENAN, RONALD D VITIELLO Attorney BERNARD SNELL added to party WILLIAM BARR(pty:res), Attorney BERNARD SNELL added to party MICHAEL J DONAHUE(pty:res), Attorney BERNARD SNELL added to party KEVIN K MACALEENAN(pty:res), Attorney BERNARD SNELL added to party RONALD D VITIELLO(pty:res)(SNELL, BERNARD)
November 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER setting briefing schedule. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES on 11-2-20. (jdl)
November 2, 2020 Filing 5 RETURN RESPONSE re #3 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by WILLIAM BARR, MICHAEL J DONAHUE, KEVIN K MACALEENAN, RONALD D VITIELLO (HELMICK, AMELIA)
October 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER for Respondent to File Responsive Pleading re: #3 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by ALBERTO LEGRA-ROMERO. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES on 10-30-20. (jdl)
October 29, 2020 Filing 3 PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS - filed by ALBERTO LEGRA-ROMERO. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(tlp)
October 23, 2020 Notice of Deficiency; Related document(s): #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by ALBERTO LEGRA-ROMERO; Pursuant to Rule 11 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, every pleading, written motion and other papers must be signed by a party personally if the party is unrepresented. You must re-file your signed document within 21 days from the date of this notice. Failure to comply with this notice may result in dismissal of your case by the Court (tlf).
October 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Hyles issued at the direction of the Court (tlf).
October 23, 2020 Filing 1 Unsigned and undated PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS filed by ALBERTO LEGRA-ROMERO. Filing fee $ 5.00, receipt number 42564. Petition being returned to petitioner via deficiency notice (Attachments: #1 Immigration Documents, #2 Envelope)(tlf).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LEGRA-ROMERO v. BARR et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: RONALD D VITIELLO
Represented By: BERNARD SNELL
Represented By: AMELIA G HELMICK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden MICHAEL J DONAHUE
Represented By: BERNARD SNELL
Represented By: AMELIA G HELMICK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: ATTORNEY GENERAL WILLIAM BARR
Represented By: BERNARD SNELL
Represented By: AMELIA G HELMICK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: KEVIN K MACALEENAN
Represented By: BERNARD SNELL
Represented By: AMELIA G HELMICK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (NOTICE)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: ALBERTO LEGRA-ROMERO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?