DIEPA-ESCALONA v. BARR et al
Petitioner: RICARDO DIEPA-ESCALONA
Respondent: CHAD WOLF, RONALD D VITIELLO, Warden MICHAEL J DONAHUE and WILLIAM BARR
Not Classified By Court: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (NOTICE)
Case Number: 4:2020cv00271
Filed: October 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: STEPHEN HYLES
Referring Judge: CLAY D LAND
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 11, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 4, 2020 Filing 9 RESPONSE in Opposition re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Declaration of Carroll E. Campbell, #2 Exhibit A- Form I-213, #3 Exhibit B- Notice to Appear, #4 Exhibit C- IJ Bond Order- flight risk dated 7.11.19, #5 Exhibit D- IJ Bond Order- no change in circumstance dated 8.2.19, #6 Exhibit E- IJ Bond Order- no change in circumstance dated 12.18.19, #7 Exhibit F- IJ Removal Order dated 2.7.2020, #8 Exhibit G- Decision to Continue Detention letter dated 6.10.2020, #9 Exhibit H- Pabel Recommendation Memo, #10 Exhibit 2- Declaration of Detention and Deportation Officer Ruben Leyva)(ABERNETHY, KEVIN)
December 4, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by KEVIN D ABERNETHY on behalf of WILLIAM BARR, MICHAEL J DONAHUE, RONALD D VITIELLO, CHAD WOLF Attorney KEVIN D ABERNETHY added to party WILLIAM BARR(pty:res), Attorney KEVIN D ABERNETHY added to party MICHAEL J DONAHUE(pty:res), Attorney KEVIN D ABERNETHY added to party RONALD D VITIELLO(pty:res), Attorney KEVIN D ABERNETHY added to party CHAD WOLF(pty:res)(ABERNETHY, KEVIN)
November 19, 2020 Filing 7 BRIEF in response to Order #6 filed by RICARDO DIEPA-ESCALONA in support of #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-C ICE records, #2 Certificate of Service, #3 Envelope)(esl)
November 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER setting briefing schedule. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES on 11-5-20. (rcg)
November 5, 2020 Filing 5 RETURN RESPONSE re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by WILLIAM BARR, MICHAEL J DONAHUE, RONALD D VITIELLO, CHAD WOLF (HELMICK, AMELIA)
November 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER for Respondents to File Responsive Pleading re: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES on 11-2-20. (rcg)
October 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Hyles issued at the direction of the Court (tlf).
October 30, 2020 Filing 2 Trust Fund Account Statement by RICARDO DIEPA-ESCALONA (tlf).
October 30, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS filed by RICARDO DIEPA-ESCALONA. Filing fee $ 5.00, receipt number 42570 (Attachments: #1 Immigration Documents, #2 Envelope) (tlf).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DIEPA-ESCALONA v. BARR et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: CHAD WOLF
Represented By: KEVIN D ABERNETHY
Represented By: AMELIA G HELMICK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: RONALD D VITIELLO
Represented By: KEVIN D ABERNETHY
Represented By: AMELIA G HELMICK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden MICHAEL J DONAHUE
Represented By: KEVIN D ABERNETHY
Represented By: AMELIA G HELMICK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: WILLIAM BARR
Represented By: KEVIN D ABERNETHY
Represented By: AMELIA G HELMICK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: RICARDO DIEPA-ESCALONA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (NOTICE)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?