LEAK et al v. US BANK NA et al
Plaintiff: JAMES LEAK, BARBARA CLARK and FRANCESTA FREEMAN
Defendant: ALTISOURCE SOLUTIONS, US BANK NA, OCWEN LOAN SERVICES, PHH MORTGAGE CORPORATION, DOES 1-50 reserve option to amend and DOES 1 - 50
Case Number: 4:2020cv00275
Filed: November 6, 2020
Court: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: CLAY D LAND
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 4, 2020 Filing 5 This is a text only entry; no document issued. ORDER denying #4 Motion to Amend/Correct; denying #4 Motion to Stay. It appears that Plaintiffs have not yet served their complaint as required by law. To the extent that Plaintiffs' motion to stay seeks to stay the service of the complaint, that motion is denied. Plaintiffs shall serve their complaint upon Defendants as required by law. Plaintiffs are allowed to amend their complaint, without leave of court, prior to Defendants' entry of an appearance in this action. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND on 12/4/2020 (amr)
December 3, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to Amend and Correct #1 Complaint and MOTION to Stay to allow time to hire an attorney filed by BARBARA CLARK, FRANCESTA FREEMAN, and JAMES LEAK (tlf).
December 3, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS returned executed by BARBARA CLARK, FRANCESTA FREEMAN, JAMES LEAK as to ALTISOURCE SOLUTIONS, OCWEN LOAN SERVICES, PHH MORTGAGE CORPORATION, and US BANK NA (tlf).
November 6, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to ALTISOURCE SOLUTIONS, OCWEN LOAN SERVICES, PHH MORTGAGE CORPORATION, US BANK NA. (Attachments: #1 Summons OCWEN, #2 Summons ALTISOURCE, #3 Summons PHH)(esl)
November 6, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ALTISOURCE SOLUTIONS, DOES, OCWEN LOAN SERVICES, PHH MORTGAGE CORPORATION, US BANK NA filed by BARBARA CLARK, FRANCESTA FREEMAN, JAMES LEAK (Attachments: #1 continuation of statement of facts, #2 continuation of relief sought, #3 jurisdictional basis, #4 exhibit list (exhibits not provided), #5 plaintiff information, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(esl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LEAK et al v. US BANK NA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES LEAK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BARBARA CLARK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FRANCESTA FREEMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALTISOURCE SOLUTIONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US BANK NA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OCWEN LOAN SERVICES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHH MORTGAGE CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1-50 reserve option to amend
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 - 50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?