AMERICAN FAMILY LIFE ASSURANCE COMPANY OF COLUMBUS v. HESSELINK
Petitioner: AMERICAN FAMILY LIFE ASSURANCE COMPANY OF COLUMBUS
Respondent: Brent Hesselink
Case Number: 4:2020cv00282
Filed: November 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: CLAY D LAND
Nature of Suit: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 09 U.S.C. ยง 1
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 8, 2020 Filing 12 STATUS REPORT by AMERICAN FAMILY LIFE ASSURANCE COMPANY OF COLUMBUS (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Joint Stipulation)(SUTTLE, BROOKS)
December 8, 2020 NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF Motion Hearing set for 12/9/2020 in this case. Counsel B Suttle advised the Court that this matter is settle. The Court agrees and Orders the hearing cancelled. (glg)
December 1, 2020 Motion Hearing set for 12/9/2020 11:00 AM in Columbus before US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND. NOTICE OF RESETTING HEARING ON MOTION Hearing will occur via VIDEOCONFERENCE. Counsel will receive connection information by separate email. This hearing is being reset from 12/2/2020 at the request of BROOKS A SUTTLE. If it is not needed please notified the courtroom deputy clerk for Judge Land. The 12/2/2020 hearing is CANCELLED. (glg)
November 25, 2020 Filing 11 This is a text only entry; no document issued. ORDER granting in part and denying in part #10 Motion for Hearing. The Court grants Plaintiff's motion for hearing but schedules the hearing for December 2, 2020 at 10:00 AM. Zoom Video Conference set for 12/2/2020 10:00 AM in Columbus before US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND. Motion Hearing set for 12/2/2020 10:00 AM in Columbus before US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND on 11/25/2020 (amr)
November 24, 2020 Filing 10 SECOND MOTION for Hearing by AMERICAN FAMILY LIFE ASSURANCE COMPANY OF COLUMBUS filed by BROOKS A SUTTLE. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Affidavit Hudson Declaration with Exhibits)(SUTTLE, BROOKS)
November 20, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by AMERICAN FAMILY LIFE ASSURANCE COMPANY OF COLUMBUS as to BRENT HESSELINK. (SUTTLE, BROOKS) Modified on 11/23/2020 (tlp) - to annotate service was by substitution.
November 18, 2020 Filing 8 This is a text only entry; no document issued. ORDER denying #6 Motion for Expedited Hearing. Plaintiff seeks an expedited hearing on its petition for enforcement of an arbitration agreement. It has not filed a motion for, nor does its petition seek, a temporary restraining order. The hearing that Plaintiff seeks would be inappropriate prior to service of the Petition on the Defendant. Because no proof of service has been filed or otherwise established, Plaintiff's request for a hearing prior to such service is denied. Once service is accomplished, Plaintiff should notify the Court, and an expedited hearing will be scheduled no sooner than 5 days after service of the Petition on Defendant. The Court understands that Plaintiff may have to respond to the California action before that time and pay a filing fee, but those circumstances are not sufficiently exceptional to authorize a hearing on the merits of Plaintiff's claim prior to service of the Petition on Defendant. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND on November 18, 2020 (CDL)
November 18, 2020 Notice of Deficiency as to #7 Memorandum in Support filed by AMERICAN FAMILY LIFE ASSURANCE COMPANY OF COLUMBUS ). PACER login ID and password used to electronically file a document constitutes the Participant's electronic signature for all purposes under the Federal Rules. All electronically filed documents must include a signature block and must set forth the filer's name, address, telephone number and e-mail address. The name on the document and the name associated with the participant's login ID must be the same, which was not the case as to #7 Memorandum. Therefore, document must be re-filed using the user credentials of the name of the attorney in the signature block. [Additionally, the memorandum in support would have been properly filed as an attachment to #6 Motion. In the future, please attach such memorandum/briefs to the main document.] (tlp)
November 17, 2020 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM in Support filed by AMERICAN FAMILY LIFE ASSURANCE COMPANY OF COLUMBUS re: #6 MOTION for Hearing re #1 Complaint, (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Hudson Declaration with Exhibits)(SUTTLE, BROOKS)
November 17, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Hearing re #1 Complaint, by AMERICAN FAMILY LIFE ASSURANCE COMPANY OF COLUMBUS filed by BROOKS A SUTTLE.(SUTTLE, BROOKS)
November 17, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to BRENT HESSELINK. (tlp)
November 17, 2020 Notice of Deficiency as to #1 Complaint. Notice of Deficiency; No need to re-file. Parties were added using title capitalization and punctuation. The case opening guide provides as follows: "***REMINDER*** all parties must be added using ALL CAPS. (i.e. LISA SMITH or DELTA AIRLINES). Do not use ANY punctuation when adding new parties. For instructions as to how to add parties, please refer to the Middle District of Georgia's Style Guide... NOTE: If the party in which you are searching is currently in the database in lowercase letters, select the party currently in the system." (tlp)
November 16, 2020 Filing 4 MEMORANDUM in Support of #1 Complaint, Petition for Order Compelling Arbitration (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Ensor Declaration with State Court Action, #2 Exhibit B - McCarty Declaration with Respondent's Associate's Agreement, #3 Exhibit C - Relevant Orders Compelling Arbitration)(SUTTLE, BROOKS)
November 16, 2020 Filing 3 Jurisdictional Statement by AMERICAN FAMILY LIFE ASSURANCE COMPANY OF COLUMBUS (SUTTLE, BROOKS)
November 16, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by AMERICAN FAMILY LIFE ASSURANCE COMPANY OF COLUMBUS identifying Corporate Parent AFLAC INCORPORATED, Other Affiliate AMERICAN FAMILY LIFE ASSURANCE COMPANY OF NEW YORK for AMERICAN FAMILY LIFE ASSURANCE COMPANY OF COLUMBUS. (SUTTLE, BROOKS)
November 16, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION against Brent Hesselink Fee paid: Receipt # AGAMDC-3627463, $400 filed by AMERICAN FAMILY LIFE ASSURANCE COMPANY OF COLUMBUS (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Proposed Order Ex. A - Proposed Order)(SUTTLE, BROOKS) Modified on 11/19/2020 (tlp).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AMERICAN FAMILY LIFE ASSURANCE COMPANY OF COLUMBUS v. HESSELINK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: AMERICAN FAMILY LIFE ASSURANCE COMPANY OF COLUMBUS
Represented By: BROOKS A SUTTLE
Represented By: R. Steve Ensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Brent Hesselink
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?