SALGADO-POLANCO v. BARR et al
Petitioner: SERGIO ANTONIO SALGADO-POLANCO
Respondent: CHAD WOLF, RONALD D VITIELLO, Warden MICHAEL J DONAHUE and WILLIAM BARR
Not Classified By Court: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (NOTICE)
Case Number: 4:2020cv00297
Filed: December 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: STEPHEN HYLES
Referring Judge: CLAY D LAND
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 15, 2021 Filing 9 RESPONSE to Court Order filed by WILLIAM BARR, MICHAEL J DONAHUE, RONALD D VITIELLO, CHAD WOLF re #7 MOTION to Dismiss Petitioner's application for a writ of habeas corpus, #8 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #7 MOTION to Dismiss Petitioner's application for a writ of habeas corpus filed by MICHAEL J DONAHUE, CHAD WOLF, RONALD D VITIELLO, WILLIAM BARR (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Form I-296, Verification of Removal)(HELMICK, AMELIA)
January 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER for Respondents to produce a copy of the warrant of removal. REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #7 MOTION to Dismiss Petitioner's application for a writ of habeas corpus filed by MICHAEL J DONAHUE, CHAD WOLF, RONALD D VITIELLO, WILLIAM BARR. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES on 1-4-21. (jdl)
January 4, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss Petitioner's application for a writ of habeas corpus by WILLIAM BARR, MICHAEL J DONAHUE, RONALD D VITIELLO, CHAD WOLF filed by AMELIA G HELMICK. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Deportation Officer Dennis Hartsfield, #2 Exhibit A - Form I-213, #3 Exhibit B - Determination of Inadmissibility, #4 Exhibit C - USCIS Record of Negative Credible/Reasonable Fear Finding, #5 Exhibit D - IJ Order dated 1-27-2020, #6 Exhibit E - IJ Bond Order - No action, dated 6-18-2020). Motion(s) referred to STEPHEN HYLES.(HELMICK, AMELIA)
December 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER setting briefing schedule. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES on 12-9-20. (rcg)
December 8, 2020 Filing 5 RETURN RESPONSE re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by WILLIAM BARR, MICHAEL J DONAHUE, RONALD D VITIELLO, CHAD WOLF (HELMICK, AMELIA)
December 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER for Respondents to File Responsive Pleading re: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES on 12-7-20. (rcg)
December 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Hyles issued at the direction of the Court (tlf).
December 4, 2020 Filing 2 Trust Fund Account Statement by SERGIO ANTONIO SALGADO-POLANCO (tlf).
December 4, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS filed by SERGIO ANTONIO SALGADO-POLANCO. Filing fee $5.00, Receipt number 42609 (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (tlf).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SALGADO-POLANCO v. BARR et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: CHAD WOLF
Represented By: AMELIA G HELMICK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: RONALD D VITIELLO
Represented By: AMELIA G HELMICK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden MICHAEL J DONAHUE
Represented By: AMELIA G HELMICK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: WILLIAM BARR
Represented By: AMELIA G HELMICK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (NOTICE)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: SERGIO ANTONIO SALGADO-POLANCO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?