WILSON v. CVS PHARMACY INC
Plaintiff: EARL WILSON
Defendant: CVS PHARMACY INC
Case Number: 4:2021cv00049
Filed: April 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: CLAY D LAND
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 25, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 25, 2021 Filing 13 JUDGMENT remanding case to the Superior Court of Muscogee County, with certified copy mailed to them (tlf).
May 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER finding as moot #2 Motion to Transfer Case; finding as moot #3 Motion to Dismiss(); finding as moot #9 Motion to Remand; granting #11 Motion to Remand. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D. LAND on 5/25/2021 (tlf).
May 24, 2021 Filing 11 JOINT MOTION to Remand by CVS PHARMACY INC filed by ROBERT GORDON SPROULE, JR. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Stipulation of Amount in Controversy)(SPROULE, ROBERT)
May 12, 2021 Filing 10 This is a text only entry; no document issued.ORDER In light of Plaintiff's motion to remand, Plaintiff shall be excused from responding to Defendant's motion to dismiss and/or transfer until further order of the Court. Defendant shall respond to Plaintiff's motion to remand within fourteen days of today's order. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND on 5/12/2021. (mdb)
May 10, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court by EARL WILSON filed by PEGGY L BROWN.(BROWN, PEGGY)
May 10, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File RESPONSE as to #2 MOTION to Transfer Case, #3 MOTION to Dismiss Complainat by EARL WILSON filed by PEGGY L BROWN. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Consent Order)(BROWN, PEGGY)
April 9, 2021 Filing 7 Jurisdictional Statement by CVS PHARMACY INC (SPROULE, ROBERT)
April 8, 2021 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #5 Jurisdictional Statement filed by CVS PHARMACY INC ); Other (wrong document attached). Document attached is a civil cover sheet, not a jurisdictional statement. Correct document must be re-filed.(esl)
April 7, 2021 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CVS PHARMACY INC identifying Corporate Parent CVS HEALTH CORPORATION for CVS PHARMACY INC. (SPROULE, ROBERT)
April 7, 2021 Filing 5 Jurisdictional Statement by CVS PHARMACY INC (SPROULE, ROBERT)
April 7, 2021 Filing 4 MEMORANDUM in Support filed by CVS PHARMACY INC re: #3 MOTION to Dismiss Complainat (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Articles of Merger of Big B, Inc. and CVS Pharmacy, Inc., #2 Exhibit Contribution Agreement, #3 Exhibit Articles of Incorporation)(SPROULE, ROBERT)
April 7, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss Complainat by CVS PHARMACY INC filed by ROBERT GORDON SPROULE, JR.(SPROULE, ROBERT)
April 7, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION to Transfer Case by CVS PHARMACY INC filed by ROBERT GORDON SPROULE, JR. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Melanie K. St Angelo)(SPROULE, ROBERT)
April 7, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL against EARL WILSON Fee paid: Receipt # AGAMDC-3761179, $402 filed by CVS PHARMACY INC (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 - Pldgs served on Deft, #3 Removal Documents Exhibit 2 - Superior Court Pldgs, #4 Exhibit 3 - Voter Registration, #5 Exhibit 4 - Property Tax Records)(SPROULE, ROBERT)
April 7, 2021 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #1 Notice of Removal, filed by CVS PHARMACY INC ); Pursuant to Local Rule 87.1, all nongovernmental corporate parties must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement. Please file the required corporate disclosures immediately. Additionally, pursuant to Local Rule 87.2 a Jurisdictional Statement must also be filed.(esl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WILSON v. CVS PHARMACY INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EARL WILSON
Represented By: PEGGY L BROWN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS PHARMACY INC
Represented By: ROBERT GORDON SPROULE, JR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?