GARNER v. JAMERSON et al
Plaintiff: KRYSTEN GARNER
Defendant: ANTONIA JAMERSON, WARREN BALTES, JUSTIN MOCK, LOWELL CLARK, DOUGLAS PERNELL, REAGAN BLACK, SCOTT CRICKMAR and TIMOTHY WARD
Case Number: 4:2022cv00094
Filed: June 9, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: CLAY D LAND
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2022 Filing 21 MOTION to Stay Discovery by WARREN BALTES, REAGAN BLACK, LOWELL CLARK, SCOTT CRICKMAR, JUSTIN MOCK, DOUGLAS PERNELL, TIMOTHY WARD filed by ANGELA ELLEN CUSIMANO. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Brief in Support)(CUSIMANO, ANGELA)
July 29, 2022 Filing 20 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by WARREN BALTES, REAGAN BLACK, LOWELL CLARK, SCOTT CRICKMAR, JUSTIN MOCK, DOUGLAS PERNELL, TIMOTHY WARD filed by ANGELA ELLEN CUSIMANO. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Brief in Support, #2 Exhibit AJC Article)(CUSIMANO, ANGELA)
July 1, 2022 Filing 19 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by KRYSTEN GARNER as to ANTONIA JAMERSON. (FREDRICKSON, ERIC)
June 28, 2022 Filing 18 This is a text only entry; no document issued. ORDER granting #17 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants Baltes, Mock, Clark, Pernell, Black, Crickmar, and Ward shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint by July 29, 2022. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND on 06/28/2022 (CCL)
June 27, 2022 Filing 17 CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by WARREN BALTES, REAGAN BLACK, LOWELL CLARK, SCOTT CRICKMAR, JUSTIN MOCK, DOUGLAS PERNELL, TIMOTHY WARD filed by ANGELA ELLEN CUSIMANO. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(CUSIMANO, ANGELA)
June 21, 2022 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by KRYSTEN GARNER as to SCOTT CRICKMAR. (FREDRICKSON, ERIC)
June 21, 2022 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by KRYSTEN GARNER as to JUSTIN MOCK. (FREDRICKSON, ERIC)
June 20, 2022 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by KRYSTEN GARNER as to WARREN BALTES. (FREDRICKSON, ERIC)
June 16, 2022 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by KRYSTEN GARNER as to TIMOTHY WARD. (FREDRICKSON, ERIC)
June 15, 2022 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by KRYSTEN GARNER as to LOWELL CLARK. (FREDRICKSON, ERIC)
June 15, 2022 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by KRYSTEN GARNER as to DOUGLAS PERNELL. (FREDRICKSON, ERIC)
June 13, 2022 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by KRYSTEN GARNER as to REAGAN BLACK. (FREDRICKSON, ERIC)
June 9, 2022 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to TIMOTHY WARD. (esl)
June 9, 2022 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to SCOTT CRICKMAR. (esl)
June 9, 2022 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to REAGAN BLACK. (esl)
June 9, 2022 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to DOUGLAS PERNELL. (esl)
June 9, 2022 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to LOWELL CLARK. (esl)
June 9, 2022 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to JUSTIN MOCK. (esl)
June 9, 2022 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to WARREN BALTES. (esl)
June 9, 2022 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to ANTONIA JAMERSON. (esl)
June 9, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Fee paid: Receipt # AGAMDC-4107358, $402 filed by KRYSTEN GARNER (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons (Jamerson), #3 Summons Summons (Baltes), #4 Summons Summons (Mock), #5 Summons Summons (Clark), #6 Summons Summons (Pernell), #7 Summons Summons (Black), #8 Summons Summons (Crickmar), #9 Summons Summons (Ward))(FREDRICKSON, ERIC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GARNER v. JAMERSON et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KRYSTEN GARNER
Represented By: ERIC FREDRICKSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANTONIA JAMERSON
Represented By: CHARLES E COX, JR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WARREN BALTES
Represented By: ANGELA ELLEN CUSIMANO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JUSTIN MOCK
Represented By: ANGELA ELLEN CUSIMANO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LOWELL CLARK
Represented By: ANGELA ELLEN CUSIMANO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOUGLAS PERNELL
Represented By: ANGELA ELLEN CUSIMANO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: REAGAN BLACK
Represented By: ANGELA ELLEN CUSIMANO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCOTT CRICKMAR
Represented By: ANGELA ELLEN CUSIMANO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TIMOTHY WARD
Represented By: ANGELA ELLEN CUSIMANO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?