LOCKE v. INTERNATIONAL PAPER COMPANY et al
Plaintiff: WAYNE E. LOCKE and WAYNE E LOCKE
Defendant: INTERNATIONAL PAPER COMPANY, INTERNATIONAL PAPER COMPANY LONG-TERM DISABILITY PLAN and SEDGWICK CLAIMS MANAGEMENT SERVICES INC
Case Number: 4:2022cv00108
Filed: July 11, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: CLAY D LAND
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1001 E.R.I.S.A.: Employee Retirement
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 8, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 8, 2022 Filing 5 Acknowledgment of Electronic Case Transfer Out by District of Western District of Tennessee; Case Number 2:22-cv-2593 (tlf).
September 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 Motion to Transfer Case. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D. LAND on 9/8/2022 (tlf).
September 8, 2022 Case Electronically Transferred Out to the Western District of Tennessee. All documents, including a certified copy of the docket sheet and pleading were transferred electronically. **The Notice of Electronic Filing serves as certification for these transferred documents.**Case Transfer Acknowledgment deadline 9/22/2022. (tlf)
September 7, 2022 Filing 3 UNOPPOSED MOTION to Transfer Case by INTERNATIONAL PAPER COMPANY, INTERNATIONAL PAPER COMPANY LONG-TERM DISABILITY PLAN filed by TIFFANY D DOWNS. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Transfer Venue, #2 Affidavit in Support of Motion to Transfer Venue, #3 Exhibit A - IP TN SOS Certificate, #4 Exhibit B - Sedgwick TN SOS Certificate, #5 Exhibit C - 2017 Plan Document, #6 Exhibit D - 2018 SPD - DIS - SAL 18-203185 - SPD, #7 Exhibit E - 1.14.22 Appeal Denial Letter, #8 Proposed Order on Motion to Transfer Venue)(DOWNS, TIFFANY)
July 21, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by TIFFANY D DOWNS on behalf of INTERNATIONAL PAPER COMPANY, INTERNATIONAL PAPER COMPANY LONG-TERM DISABILITY PLAN Attorney TIFFANY D DOWNS added to party INTERNATIONAL PAPER COMPANY(pty:dft), Attorney TIFFANY D DOWNS added to party INTERNATIONAL PAPER COMPANY LONG-TERM DISABILITY PLAN(pty:dft)(DOWNS, TIFFANY)
July 11, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Fee paid: Receipt # AGAMDC-4131945, $402 filed by WAYNE E. LOCKE (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(PYLES, BRADLEY)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LOCKE v. INTERNATIONAL PAPER COMPANY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WAYNE E. LOCKE
Represented By: BRADLEY G PYLES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WAYNE E LOCKE
Represented By: BRADLEY G PYLES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INTERNATIONAL PAPER COMPANY
Represented By: TIFFANY D DOWNS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INTERNATIONAL PAPER COMPANY LONG-TERM DISABILITY PLAN
Represented By: TIFFANY D DOWNS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SEDGWICK CLAIMS MANAGEMENT SERVICES INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?