CUMMINS v. COUNTRYMAN
Petitioner: QUANESHA CUMMINS
Respondent: MUSCOGEE COUNTY JAIL and Sheriff GREG COUNTRYMAN
Case Number: 4:2023cv00043
Filed: March 8, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: STEPHEN HYLES
Referring Judge: CLAY D LAND
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus: General
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 8, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 1, 2023 Filing 5 Mail Returned- #4 Order to Show Cause sent to petitioner returned as Not Here Return to Sender (tlf).
April 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES on 4/13/23. (mjm)
March 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER for Petitioner to sign and date #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by QUANESHA CUMMINS. ORDER to pay the filing fee or file a motion to proceed IFP. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES on 3/21/23. (mjm)
March 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Hyles issued at the direction of the Court (tlf).
March 8, 2023 Filing 1 PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS filed by QUANESHA CUMMINS (petition did not include a page 15). (Attachments: #1 State Court Document and illegible handwritten document (documents were received in torn condition), #2 Letter from Clerk, #3 Envelope) (tlf).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CUMMINS v. COUNTRYMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: QUANESHA CUMMINS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: MUSCOGEE COUNTY JAIL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Sheriff GREG COUNTRYMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?