BREWSTER v. FORTSON et al
Plaintiff: GEORGE WALTER BREWSTER, III
Defendant: COURTNEY FORTSON and MUSCOGEE COUNTY JAIL
Case Number: 4:2023cv00079
Filed: May 9, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: STEPHEN HYLES
Referring Judge: CLAY D LAND
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 27, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 27, 2023 Filing 7 JUDGMENT dismissing case (tlf).
June 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER dismissing #1 Complaint and denying #2 motion to proceed IFP. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D. LAND on 6/27/2023 (tlf).
May 30, 2023 Filing 5 Statement of Claims and Statement of Facts by GEORGE WALTER BREWSTER III (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (tlf).
May 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge issued at the direction of the Court. (tlp)
May 9, 2023 Filing 3 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by GEORGE WALTER BREWSTER, III re: #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (tlp)
May 9, 2023 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis - Filed by GEORGE WALTER BREWSTER, III. (Attachments: #1 Envelope). Motion(s) referred to STEPHEN HYLES.(tlp)
May 9, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against COURTNEY FORTSON and MUSCOGEE COUNTY JAIL - filed by GEORGE WALTER BREWSTER, III. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Cover Letter, #2 Exhibit A1 - RE: Grievance as to unknown officer, #3 Exhibit A2 - RE: Grievance as to Officer Fortson, #4 Exhibit A3 - RE: Grievance as to mental health staff, #5 Exhibit A4 - RE: Grievance as to facility, #6 Envelope)(tlp) Modified to correct party on 5/9/2023 (rlw).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BREWSTER v. FORTSON et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GEORGE WALTER BREWSTER, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COURTNEY FORTSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MUSCOGEE COUNTY JAIL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?