JOHNSON v. MUSCOGEE COUNTY JAIL et al
Plaintiff: HERRON LEE JOHNSON
Defendant: MUSCOGEE COUNTY JAIL, MUSCOGEE COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE and COLUMBUS GEORGIA
Case Number: 4:2023cv00131
Filed: July 11, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: STEPHEN HYLES
Referring Judge: CLAY D LAND
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 8, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 8, 2023 Filing 11 JUDGMENT dismissing case. (esl)
September 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER dismissing case without prejudice. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND on 9/8/2023. (esl)
August 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES on 8/17/2023. (mlb)
August 2, 2023 Filing 8 Letter regarding plaintiff not currently incarcerated at MCJ as to #6 Order (tlf).
July 26, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE of Change of Address (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(tlf).
July 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER to Recast Complaint; granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff is ordered to pay an initial partial filing fee of $17.20. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES on 7/25/23. (mjm)
July 24, 2023 Filing 5 BRIEF filed by HERRON LEE JOHNSON as to #1 Complaint (Attachments: #1 Investigative Findings, #2 Envelope) (tlf).
July 13, 2023 Filing 4 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by HERRON LEE JOHNSON as to #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (tlf).
July 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Hyles issued at the direction of the Court (tlf).
July 11, 2023 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by HERRON LEE JOHNSON. (Attachments: #1 Trust Account Statement - Incomplete). Motion referred to U.S. Magistrate Judge STEPHEN HYLES (tlf).
July 11, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by HERRON LEE JOHNSON against All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (tlf).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JOHNSON v. MUSCOGEE COUNTY JAIL et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HERRON LEE JOHNSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MUSCOGEE COUNTY JAIL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MUSCOGEE COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COLUMBUS GEORGIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?