NATIONAL RANGER MEMORIAL FOUNDATION INC v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE et al
Plaintiff: The National Ranger Memorial Foundation and NATIONAL RANGER MEMORIAL FOUNDATION INC
Defendant: UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, Austin Lloyd, William Laplante, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE ARMY, CHRISTINE WORMUTH and LLOYD AUSTIN
Case Number: 4:2023cv00170
Filed: September 27, 2023
Court: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: CLAY D LAND
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 702 Administrative Procedure Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 16, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by SARAH SUWANDA on behalf of All Defendants Attorney SARAH SUWANDA added to party LLOYD AUSTIN(pty:dft), Attorney SARAH SUWANDA added to party WILLIAM LAPLANTE(pty:dft), Attorney SARAH SUWANDA added to party UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE(pty:dft), Attorney SARAH SUWANDA added to party UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE ARMY(pty:dft), Attorney SARAH SUWANDA added to party CHRISTINE WORMUTH(pty:dft)(SUWANDA, SARAH)
October 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by NATIONAL RANGER MEMORIAL FOUNDATION INC re #4 Summons Issued, (CORLEY, JONATHAN)
September 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Summons Issued as to LLOYD AUSTIN, WILLIAM LAPLANTE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE ARMY, CHRISTINE WORMUTH. (Attachments: #1 US Department of the Army, #2 Lloyd Austin, #3 Christine Wormuth, #4 William Laplante)(esl)
September 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by NATIONAL RANGER MEMORIAL FOUNDATION INC (CORLEY, JONATHAN)
September 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 COMPLAINT (IFP) against All Defendants filed by NATIONAL RANGER MEMORIAL FOUNDATION INC (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Letter from Ranger Memorial Foundation, Inc., #3 Exhibit Letter from Secretary of the Army, #4 Exhibit Acceptance of Conditional Gift, #5 Exhibit The Naming Commission Report to Congress Pt. III, #6 Exhibit DOD Supplemental Inventory)(CORLEY, JONATHAN)
September 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Notice of Deficiency: Related document: #1 Complaint, filed by The National Ranger Memorial Foundation; Parties were added using punctuation AND/OR title capitalization. The attorney case opening guide states ***REMINDER*** all parties must be added using ALL CAPS (ie LISA SMITH or DELTA AIRLINES). Do not use ANY punctuation when adding new parties. For instructions on adding parties, please refer to the Style Guide located on the website for the Middle District of Georgia. Notice of Deficiency: Document must be converted into text-searchable PDF format and re-filed. See CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Notice of Deficiency: Document must be re-filed to include a description of attachment(s). A generic identifier such as Exhibit A or Exhibit 1 is not acceptable. An example of a properly identified attachment would be Exhibit A Letter from A. Hamilton to A. Burr. See CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Notice of Deficiency: To avoid re-paying the filing fee, please docket as Civil Events, Initial Pleadings and Service, Attorney Initiating Documents, Complaint (IFP). Make the civil cover sheet and any proposed summonses separate attachments to the complaint. There is an attorney case opening guide on or website under, Case Info, CM/ECF Information, Helpful documents which can be of assistance in the future (tlf).
September 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 A deficiency notice was entered for this entry with instructions to filer it must be corrected and re-filed. COMPLAINT against All Defendants Fee paid: Receipt # AGAMDC-4469594, $402 filed by The National Ranger Memorial Foundation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E)(CORLEY, JONATHAN) Modified on 9/28/2023 (tlf).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NATIONAL RANGER MEMORIAL FOUNDATION INC v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The National Ranger Memorial Foundation
Represented By: JONATHAN CORLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NATIONAL RANGER MEMORIAL FOUNDATION INC
Represented By: JONATHAN CORLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE
Represented By: SARAH SUWANDA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Austin Lloyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Laplante
Represented By: SARAH SUWANDA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE ARMY
Represented By: SARAH SUWANDA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHRISTINE WORMUTH
Represented By: SARAH SUWANDA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LLOYD AUSTIN
Represented By: SARAH SUWANDA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?