Brown v. Sikes, et al
Petitioner: WALTER LEE BROWN
Respondent: Johnny C. Sikes
Case Number: 5:1996cv00058
Filed: February 20, 1996
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Office: Macon Office
Presiding Judge: C. Ashley Royal
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER adopting 110 Report and Recommendations and denying 107 Motion to Reopen Judgment Denying Habeas Corpus Petition. A certificate of appealability is DENIED. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE C ASHLEY ROYAL on 12/19/18 (lap)
January 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER denying 82 Motion to Set Aside Judgment; denying 83 Motion for Disqualification and Recusal; finding as moot 85 Motion for Ruling on the Motion for Disqualification and Recusal. A certificate of appealability of denied. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE C ASHLEY ROYAL on 1/24/17 (lap)
April 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER denying 41 Motion for Copies; denying 42 Motion for Certificate of Appealability. Ordered by Judge C. Ashley Royal on 4/20/12 (lap)
March 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER dismissing for lack of jurisdiction 39 Motion to Set Aside Judgment. Ordered by Judge C. Ashley Royal on 3/30/12 (lap)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. Sikes, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: WALTER LEE BROWN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Johnny C. Sikes
Represented By: Allison Beth Vrolijk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?